Clark v. California Department Of Corrections And Rehabilitations Substance Abuse Treatment Facility et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Clark
Defendant: California Department Of Corrections And Rehabilitations Substance Abuse Treatment Facility, Kokor and Ugwueze
Case Number: 1:2012cv00461
Filed: March 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS REGARDING DISMISSAL OF ACTION FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE AND DENIAL OF PENDING MOTIONS WITHOUT PREJUDICE re 17 , 28 , 30 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/24/2015. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 4/27/2015.(Lundstrom, T)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DISCHARGING 28 Order to Show Cause Why Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute and ORDER GRANTING 29 Plaintiff's Request for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/3/2015. Opposition to Motion to Dismiss due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/13/2015. Show Cause Response due within twenty-one (21) days. (Jessen, A)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER requiring Plaintiff to file opposition or statement of non-opposition re 17 MOTION to DISMISS signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/7/2014. (Filing Deadline: 12/1/2014).(Lundstrom, T)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DISCHARGING 19 Order to Show Good Cause for Failing to Waive Service and ORDER Requiring Defendants Kokor and Ugwueze to Pay to the United States Marshal the Costs Incurred in Effecting Service Within Twenty (20) Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/29/2014. cc: USM Sacramento. (Jessen, A)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Providing Defendants With the Opportunity to Show Good Cause for Failing to Waive Service signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/25/2014. Show Cause Response due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting Defendants' Request for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading re 15 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 03/21/14. Thirty-Five Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER to Re-Caption Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/11/14. (Verduzco, M)
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Finding Certain Claims Cognizable and Dismissing Remaining Claims and Defendants signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/23/2013. California Department Of Corrections And Rehabilitations Substance Abuse Treatment Facility terminated. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. California Department Of Corrections And Rehabilitations Substance Abuse Treatment Facility et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department Of Corrections And Rehabilitations Substance Abuse Treatment Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kokor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ugwueze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?