Hanna v. Mariposa County Sheriff Dept. et al
Plaintiff: Richard Charles Hanna
Defendant: Mariposa County Sheriff Dept., Boehm, Rumfelt, Rameriz and King
Case Number: 1:2012cv00501
Filed: April 2, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with Prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedue 41(a) and DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to Close the action,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 07/06/2015. CASE CLOSED (Martin-Gill, S)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER VACATING Dates and REQUIRING Parties to File Dispositional Documents within Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/16/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER denying 167 Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/4/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 166 Order DENYING Plaintiff's 165 Motion to Compel, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/30/2015. (Rosales, O)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 164 Order re: stipulated 163 protective order; Order STRIKING 162 first stipulated protective order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/20/2015. (Rosales, O)
December 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Subpoena Duces Tecum (ECF No. 160 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/31/2014. (Fahrney, E)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Leave To File An Amended Complaint As Futile (ECF No. 158 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/10/2014. (Fahrney, E)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE FOR ALL PURPOSE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE STANLEY A. BOONE signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/3/2014. New Case No. 1:12-cv-00501-SAB.(Lundstrom, T)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER DENYING 141 Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default and 144 Motion to Vacate the Mandatory Scheduling Conference and Disregarding 148 Plaintiff's Offer of Settlement; and ORDER Requiring Defendants Boehm, King, Ramirez, and Rumfelt to Reimburse United States Marshal Within Thirty (30) Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/31/2014. Eugene Action terminated as defendant and attorney. cc: USM Sacramento. (Jessen, A)
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER Requiring Defendants Boehm, King, Ramirez, and Rumfelt to Respond to Order to Show Cause filed July 23, 2013, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/1/14. 20-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER denying 130 Request for Entry of Default signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/25/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER DENYING 124 Motion for Court Records and Transcripts, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/18/2014. (Kusamura, W)
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER Directing United States Marshal To Initiate Re-Service On Defendants Boehm, Rumfelt, Ramirez, And King, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/23/2014. It is ORDERED that: The Clerk of the Court is directed to forward service documents to the United States Marshals Service for Defendants' DEPUTY MICHAEL KING, DEPUTY CHRISTOPHER BOEHM, DEPUTY DONALD T. RUMFELT and SERGEANT CHRISTOPHER RAMIREZ.(Fahrney, E)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER Adopting FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS (ECF Nos. 85 , 92 , 105 , 110 , 111 , 112 , 113 , 115 ), signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/18/2014. It is ORDERED that: The Findings and Recommendations, filed June 5, 2014, is ADOPTED IN FULL. The Motion to Dismiss filed December 31, 2013 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as follows: Defendants motion to dismiss on the basis of res judicata is GRANTED as to Defendant Mariposa County Sheriff Department, and DENIED as to Defenda nts Boehm, Rumfelt, Rameriz, and King; Defendants motion to dismiss for improper service on the individual Defendants is GRANTED, and the United States Marshal shall be ordered to re-serve the summons and complaint; Defendants motion to dismiss the p unitive damages claim against Defendant Mariposa County Sheriff Department is GRANTED;Defendants motion to dismiss on all other grounds is DENIED; and This action is referred back to the magistrate judge to initiate service of process on Defendants Boehm, Rumfelt, Rameriz, and King. (Fahrney, E)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER DENYING 114 Plaintiff's Motion for Subpoena Duces Tecum signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/7/2014. (Jessen, A)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Granting In Part and Denying In Part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 85 , 92 , 105 , 110 , 111 ; Objections Due Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/4/14: Matter referred to Judge Ishii. (Hellings, J)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER STRIKING plaintiff's objection, document 106 , to the Findings and Recommendations issued on 3/17/2014, in a related action, Hanna v. County of Mariposa, 1:12-CV-1885 AWI SAB, in that the objection does not pertain to this action. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/16/2014. (Rooney, M)
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Requiring The Parties to Submit Supplemental Briefing, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/10/2014. (IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that:1. Defendants shall file their supplemental briefing by April 25, 2014; and2. Plaintiffs response to the supplemental briefing shall be filed on or before May 16, 2014.) (Hernandez, M)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER ADOPTING 97 Findings and Recommendations, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/6/2014. Motion for Preliminary Injunction 93 is DENIED. (Marrujo, C)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's 83 Motion and Striking 81 declaration of Renee Ritter, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/18/2014. (Figueroa, O)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For A Private Investigator (ECF No. 99 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/5/2014. (Fahrney, E)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER Directing The Clerk Of The Court To File Document In Case No. 1:12-cv-01285-AWI-SAB (ECF No. 94 ), signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/24/2014. (Fahrney, E)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER adopting 87 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; granting 57 Motion to Set Aside Default and REFERRING CASE back to Magistrate Judge signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/23/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to file documents in Case No. 1:12-cv-01885-AWI-SAB signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/14/2014 re 55 , 56 , 72 , 79 . (Lundstrom, T)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 83 Motion to Strike and Referring Matter to Magistrate Judge signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/10/2014. (Jessen, A)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 57 Defendants' Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment be GRANTED re 1 Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/8/2014. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Order DENYING Plaintiff's 73 Motion to Compel and 74 Motion for Subpoena, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/18/2013. The order issued October 30, 2013, is hereby STAYED.(Figueroa, O)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Requiring Counsel to Provide Additional Documentation Within Fifteen (15) Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/4/2013. (Jessen, A)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER DENYING 52 Plaintiff's Motion for a Subpoena Duces Tecum signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/15/2013. (Jessen, A)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER REQUIRING Eugene Action, Esq. to Respond to Response to Order to Show Cause Within Fourteen (14) Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/14/2013. (Jessen, A)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER RELATING CASES and ORDER REFERRING Matters to Magistrate Judge signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/8/2013. (Jessen, A)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 42 Motion for Issuance of a Subpoena Duces Tecum signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/16/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER requiring Plaintiff to provide additional information re 42 MOTION for duces tecum to gain copy of video. (Filing Deadline: 11/4/2013). (Lundstrom, T)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DISCHARGING 36 Order to Show Cause signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/9/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO EITHER SHOW CAUSE Why this Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute or File a Motion for Entry of Default Within Thirty Days, Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/23/2013. (Arellano, S.)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE re 33 , Requiring Defendants Mariposa County Sheriff Department, Boehm, King, Rameriz and Rumfelt to Show Cause why the United States Marshal's Request for Reimbursement of Costs of Service should not be granted, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 7/23/13. (20) Day Deadline (Martin-Gill, S)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DENYING 29 Plaintiff's Motion to Order the Preservation of Documents signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 5/16/2013. (Jessen, A)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DENYING 27 Plaintiff's Motion to Order Defendants to File Responsive Pleading signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 5/6/2013. (Jessen, A)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING 24 Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 3/5/2013. (Figueroa, O)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by the United States Marshal Without Prepayment of Costs signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 1/8/2013. (Jessen, A)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DENYING 20 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/17/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/3/2012 vacating 14 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and directing Clerk to re-serve documents 12 Order, 13 Order. (Case Management Deadline: 1/7/2013 for Plaintiff to return documents).(Lundstrom, T)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS regarding Dismissal of Action re 1 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/20/2012. Matter is referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 9/24/2012. (Figueroa, O)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanna v. Mariposa County Sheriff Dept. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Charles Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mariposa County Sheriff Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rumfelt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rameriz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?