Arias et al v. Amador et al
Plaintiff: Elida Arias and Jose J. Martinez
Defendant: Julio Amador, Dedra Borges, Jason Coley, Pat Dayton, Bryan Ferreira, Mike Perez, Jon Vera, Art De Werk and City of Ceres
Case Number: 1:2012cv00586
Filed: April 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Order denying 88 Bill of Costs pursuant to stipulation, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/13/2015. (Rosales, O)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Re: Defendant Dedra Borges, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/6/2015. Dedra Borges terminated. (Fahrney, E)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Dismissing Defendant Mike Perez, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/3/2015. Mike Perez terminated.(Fahrney, E)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Doc. 54) signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on January 6, 2015. Motion Hearing currently set for 1/12/2015 is VACATED. (Munoz, I)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 31 Defendants' MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/21/2014. (Jessen, A)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER to REOPEN CASE and DISMISS Defendants City of Ceres and Art De Werk, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/22/2014. (Marrujo, C)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER to DISMISS and CLOSE CASE, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/22/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER setting Settlement Conference for 3/4/2014 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/30/2013. (Hernandez, M)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/18/2013. (Hernandez, M)
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 04/17/2012. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arias et al v. Amador et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elida Arias
Represented By: Frank M Pacheco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose J. Martinez
Represented By: Frank M Pacheco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julio Amador
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dedra Borges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Coley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Dayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Ferreira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Vera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Art De Werk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Ceres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?