April 7, 2015 |
Filing
79
ORDER GRANTING 73 Motion for Judgment, due to the Failure of Plantiff to establish the necessary element of "Favorable Termination"; ORDERED that Judgment In Favor of Defendant pursuant to FRCP 52(c), signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 04/7/15. CASE CLOSED (Martin-Gill, S)
|
December 11, 2014 |
Filing
63
ORDER Discharging 60 Order to Show Cause, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/11/2014. (IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The December 3 Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED; and 2. The pre-trial conference set for 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom No. 2 on December 15, 2014 remains on calendar and the parties shall personally appear at that time.)(Gaumnitz, R)
|
December 3, 2014 |
Filing
60
ORDER VACATING December 10, 20014 Pretrial Conference and Order For Plaintiffs' to Show Cause, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/3/2014. (Pretrial Conference previously set for 12/10/2014, is RESET for 12/15/2014, at 03:00 PM i n Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, PERSONAL APPEARANCES REQUIRED; Plaintiffs are to file a pretrial conference statement with the Court on or by 1:00 p.m. on December 11, 2014; Plaintiffs are to show cause in writing no later than 1:00 p.m. on December 11, 2014, why sanctions should not be imposed.)(Gaumnitz, R)
|
March 20, 2014 |
Filing
49
ORDER THAT THE PARTIES SUBMIT A JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT. The parties must cooperate in preparing the Joint Scheduling Conference Report and SHALL file the Report by no later than March 25, 2014. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/20/2014. (Timken, A)
|
February 19, 2014 |
Filing
47
ORDER SETTING Scheduling Conference. A Scheduling Conference is set for 4/1/2014, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties' joint scheduling report shall be filed by no later than 3/25/2014. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/19/2014. (Timken, A)
|
February 5, 2014 |
Filing
45
ORDER ADOPTING 44 Findings and Recommendations That Defendant's 39 Anti-SLAPP Motion and Request for Attorney's Fees be DENIED, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/4/2014. Allstate Shall File an Answer or Other Responsive Pleading Within 21 Days. (Marrujo, C)
|
January 6, 2014 |
Filing
44
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendant's Anti-Slapp Motion and Request for Attorney's Fees 39 be Denied. Matter referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due within twenty-one (21) days of service of this recommendation; signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/6/2014. (Timken, A)
|
May 21, 2013 |
Filing
32
ORDER ADOPTING 28 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER GRANTING 24 Motion for Relief;ORDERED to Reopen case, the order closing this case is set aside; ORDERED to file Plaintiff's Lodged Amended Complaint held in Abeyance 29 , 30 , should now be filed in as of the date of this order; ORDERED Joseph Todd Armas, within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this order to file Substitution of Attorney or Motion to Withdraw as Counsel; ORDERED Clerk to serve Plaintiff's a copy of this order via U.S. Mail, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 05/21/2013. (21) Day Deadline(Martin-Gill, S)
|
May 13, 2013 |
Filing
30
ORDER Holding In Abeyance Plaintiff's Lodged First Amended Complaint 29 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/10/13. (Gonzalez, R)
|
April 22, 2013 |
Filing
28
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 24 Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief be GRANTED and the Case be Reopended. Matter referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 5/16/2013; signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/22/2013. (Timken, A)
|
December 14, 2012 |
Filing
26
ORDER Vacating January 9, 2013 Hearing Date and Denying 22 Motion Without Prejudice, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/14/12. (Gonzalez, R)
|
December 13, 2012 |
Filing
25
ORDER Directing Clerk to File a Copy of Plaintiffs' Opposition/Response (Doc. 12 in 1:12-cv-1762) in this Case and Title the Document "Motion for Relief"; ORDER that the Motion is Referred to the Magistrate Judge to Conduct Further Proceedings; and ORDER Directing Clerk to Mail a Copy of the Findings and Recommendations (Doc. 16 ) to Plaintiffs, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/12/2012. (Jessen, A)
|
November 21, 2012 |
Filing
20
ORDER CLOSING CASE for Failure to File Amended Complaint signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/20/2012. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
|
October 17, 2012 |
Filing
18
ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONSThat Defendant's Anti-SLAPP Motion and REQUEST for Attorney's Fees Be GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART 16 , signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/16/12: Plaintiffs Efrain Garcia and Ofelia Garcia's complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice and with 21 days leave to file an amended complaint. (Hellings, J)
|
September 18, 2012 |
Filing
16
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendant's Anti-Slapp Motion and Request for Attorney's Fees 13 be GRANTED in Part and DENIED in Part. The Court RECOMMENDS that: 1) Defendant's anti-SLAPP motion be GRANTED IN PART an d DENIED IN PART; 2) Plaintiffs' complaint be DISMISSED without prejudice and Plaintiffs be GRANTED twenty-one (21) days leave to file an amended complaint; and 3) Defendant's request for an award of attorney's fees be DENIED. Matter referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due within twenty-one (21) days of service of this recommendation; signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/17/2012. (Timken, A)
|
June 5, 2012 |
Filing
10
STIPULATION and ORDER Granting Second extension for defendant's time to file Anti-Slapp Motion, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/5/2012. (Kusamura, W)
|
May 22, 2012 |
Filing
8
ORDER GRANTING stipulation 6 to extend Defendant's time to file anti-slapp motion. Defendant's time to file an anti-SLAPP motion is extended to 6/4/2012. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/21/2012. (Timken, A)
|