Williams v. Steglinski et al
Plaintiff: Gary Williams
Defendant: S. Steglinski, R. Dyer, H. Kaur, Sgt. Epperson and R.M. Horton
Case Number: 1:2012cv00786
Filed: May 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Gerald B. Cohn
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 JUDGMENT dated *4/21/2016* in favor of Defendant against Plaintiff pursuant to order (Kusamura, W)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER that Inmate Gary Williams is No Longer Needed as Witness/Plaintiff in These Proceedings, and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is Discharged, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/21/16. (Gonzalez, R)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Denying Defendant's Motion to Exclude M. Davis as a Witness 90 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/28/16. (Verduzco, M)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Gary Williams, CDCR #K-19320, for Trial on April 19, 2016 at 8:00 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/18/2016. (Flores, E)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 PRETRIAL ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/05/2016. Jury Trial set for 4/19/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone.(Flores, E)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 SECOND TRIAL ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 01/22/2016. (Motion In Limine Deadlines: Filing 02/22/2016; Opposition 03/14/2016; Reply 03/21/2016; Hearing 03/28/2016 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 9 (SAB); Trial Date 04/07/2016 at 8:30 a.m. in Courtroom 9 (SAB); 2 Days)(Martin-Gill, S)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Submit Pretrial Statement by January 20, 2016, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/13/2016. (Jessen, A)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Setting Telephonic Conference Hearing, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/4/15: Telephonic Scheduling Hearing set for 9/14/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Hellings, J)
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Adopting In Part Findings And Recommendations, And Granting In Part And Denying In Part Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment (ECF Nos. 58 , 66 , 67 , 68 , 69 ), signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/11/2015. (Fahrney, E)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' 58 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 06/09/2015. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 7/13/2015. (Flores, E)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Granting Defendants' Request to Withdraw 53 Motion to Compel, Filed October 15, 2014 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/05/2014. (Flores, E)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER ADOPTING 48 Findings and Recommendations, GRANTING Defendants' 38 Motion for Summary Judgment, DISMISSING Defendants Epperson, Horton, and Kaur for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies, and REFERRING Matter Back to Magistrate Judge for Further Proceedings, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/30/2014. (Marrujo, C)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Appointment Of Counsel, Without Prejudice (ECF No. 49 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/5/2014. (Fahrney, E)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' 38 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/01/2014. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 9/3/2014. (Flores, E)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting Defendants' 46 Request to Take Plaintiff's Deposition by Videoconference signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 07/28/2014. (Flores, E)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Denying 42 Plaintiff's Motion Accept Opposition in Excess of Twenty Pages as Unnecessary, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/1/14. (Verduzco, M)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Denying as Moot Plaintiff's Pending 18 30 35 Motions signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 06/03/2014. (Flores, E)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 33 Request to Withdraw, Without Prejudice, the Portion of Pending Motion to Dismiss Relating to Exhaustion of Administrative Remedies, and Re-File Within Thirty Days as Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/29/2014. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Steglinski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Steglinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Dyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Kaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Epperson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.M. Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?