Halajian v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Co. et al
Plaintiff: Barry Halajian
Defendant: NDEX West LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A., Whitney K Cook and Deutsche Bank National Trust Co.
Case Number: 1:2012cv00814
Filed: May 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Granting Defendants' 62 65 Motions for Summary Judgment signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 01/09/2015. CASE CLOSED. (Flores, E)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER VACATING Future Dates, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/27/2014. (The Court hereby VACATES all future dates, including the June 12, 2014 pretrial conference and the August 12, 2014 trial dates. The Court shall schedule a trial-setting conference if necessary after an order on the motions for summary judgment has been issued.)(Gaumnitz, R)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER VACATING Hearing Date and Taking Matter Under Submission, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/27/2014. (The hearing date of June 2, 2014 is hereby VACATED and the parties shall not appear at that time. The Court will take motions 62 and 65 under submission and thereafter issue its decision.) (Gaumnitz, R)
May 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting stipulation to continue Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2014 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii.) signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on May 2, 2014. (Nazaroff, H)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. AND WHITNEY K. COOKS REQUEST TO FILE CERTAIN EXHIBITS ATTACHED TO A DECLARATION FILED IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT UNDER SEAL re 65 signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/14/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Adopting 59 Joint Stipulation to Continue Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline, the Pretrial Conference and Trial, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/14/2014. (Case schedule modified as follows; Dispositive Motion cutt-off continued to 4/11/2014, Pretrial Conference continued to 6/12/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, and Jury Trial continued to 8/12/2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii.)(Gaumnitz, R)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/6/2013 granting 54 Stipulation to continue Trial and Pretrial Dates. (Lundstrom, T) Modified on 12/9/2013 (Nazaroff, H). PLEASE DISREGARD THIS ENTRY AS MAGISTRATE AUSTIN HAD PREVIOUSLY REVISED THE SCHEDULING.
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Granting 51 Joint Stipulation to Continue Trial and Pre-Trial Dates signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/4/2013. Dispositive motion deadline extended to 12/13/2013; Pretrial Conference continued to 2/13/2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Jury Trial continued to 4/15/2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Martinez, A)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER to Extend Time for Defendants to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/22/2013. (Martinez, A)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Defendants' 30 32 Motions to Dismiss signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/13/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER VACATING hearing date of October 29, 2012 and taking matters 30 & 32 under submission, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/23/2012. (Kusamura, W)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SECOND ORDER For an Extension of Time For Defendants to Answer, Plead, or Otherwise Respond To Plaintiff's Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/2/2012. (Defendants shall have until 9/14/2012 to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint.)(Gaumnitz, R)
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/17/2012. (Bradley, A)
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ; denying 13 Motion for TRO signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/18/12. (Nazaroff, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halajian v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDEX West LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitney K Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Halajian
Represented By: Randy Risner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?