Gilmore v. Augustus, et al.
Plaintiff: C. Dwayne Gilmore
Defendant: D. Augustus, J. S. Diaz, C. Lockard, C. Lopez, J. Hightower, J. J. Torres, A. Serna, B. Ismat, I. Bari, J. Canada and Z. Nartume
Case Number: 1:2012cv00925
Filed: June 7, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER Setting Mandatory Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/6/20. Scheduling Conference set for 10/27/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Gonzalez, R)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER Directing Parties to Advise the Court Whether Further Discovery is Necessary Regarding Defendant Elizabeth Torres Within Twenty-One (21) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/14/2020. (Jessen, A)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 275 Motion to Substitute Successor in Interest in For Defendant Johnny "JJ" Torres, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/18/2020. (Marrujo, C)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Bill of Costs as Untimely, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/24/2020. (Marrujo, C)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to Submit Proof of Service of Motion to Substitute or Properly Serve the 275 Motion to Substitute, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/16/2020. Ten Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER VACATING December 3, 2015 Order; ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction and Reassigning Action to District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and Magistrate Stanley A. Boone 151 153 ; ORDER DI RECTING Clerk of Court to Reassign Case to District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and Magistrate Stanley A. Boone; ORDER DIRECTING Defendants to File and Serve a Suggestion of Defendant Torres' Death on Plaintiff and Defendant Torres' Successor or Personal Representative; New Case number is 1:12-cv-00925 LJO-SAB (PC), signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/6/19.(Filing Deadline: 30-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 256 JUDGMENT in a Civil Action. (Flores, E)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER Finalizing Rulings on Plaintiff's Motions In Limine signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/27/2017. (Flores, E)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motions In Limine signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/17/2017. (Flores, E)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER Regarding Tentative Rulings Plaintiff's 239 Motions In Limine signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/16/2017. Telephonic Motion in Limine Hearing set for 2/27/2017 at 03:45 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone.(Flores, E)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER Regarding Motions in Limine 217 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/13/17. (Hellings, J)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 227 Motion to Admit Discovery Requests and Responses into Evidence signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/01/2017. (Flores, E)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER Granting 222 Extension of Time to Plaintiff to File Motions in Limine; ORDER Directing Clerk to Email Copy of Order to Litigation Coordinator signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 01/272017. (Flores, E)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER Directing Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Court to Enforce Order and Modify Trial Scheduling Order Deadlines signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 01/24/2017. (Flores, E)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to produce C. Dwayne Gilmore, CDC# T-29666, via Videoconference at California State Prison, Centinela on January 23, 2017 at 9:00 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/18/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference on January 23, 2017 at 9:00 A.M. before United States Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/17/17.(Settlement Conference set for 1/23/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN)in Sacramento, CA before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman) (Martin-Gill, S)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER Resetting Telephonic Pretrial Conference (Time Only), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/6/17. (Hellings, J)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER REGARDING Defendant's 209 Motion to Continue Trial Date; Plaintiff's Opposition Filing Deadline: December 30, 2016 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/16/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER SETTING Telephonic Conference Call signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/27/2016. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/3/2016 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Sant Agata, S)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER ADOPTING 196 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 156 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 09/22/2016. (Flores, E)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 197 Motion to Set a Trial Date as Premature signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/24/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 196 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Plaintiff's 156 Motion for Summary Judgment be Denied, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/4/16. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Ruling 194 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/10/16. (Hellings, J)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 192 Motion for Assistance at Trial signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/27/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER DENYING 190 Motion to Set Trial Date AS PREMATURE, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 05/19/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER Vacating Settlement Conference; ORDER Vacating 184 Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/20/16. (Gonzalez, R)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport Inmate C. Dwayne Gilmore, CDCR #T-29666 on May 13, 2016 at 10:30 AM, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/13/16. (Hellings, J)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Second 182 Motion for Appointment of Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/23/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/4/16. Settlement Conference set for 5/13/2016 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. (Gonzalez, R)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 169 Motion for Sanctions signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/23/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 151 Motion to Revoke Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/03/2015. (Flores, E)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER DISCHARGING Order to Show Cause 134 ; ORDER DENYING 87 and 96 Motion to Compel ; ORDER GRANTING 92 Motion to Compel;ORDER DENYING 111 , 115 and 121 Motions ; ORDER DENYING 136 Motion to Compel; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Request for Extension of Time 146 ; ORDER EXTENDING Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline to December 1, 2015, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 09/3/2015. ( Dispositive Motions filed by 12/1/2015) (Martin-Gill, S)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 130 Motion for Reconsideration; ORDER to SHOW CAUSE: Order Requiring Defendant Lockard to Show Cause Why Default Should Not be Entered Against Him; Thirty Day Deadline for Defendant Lockard to File Response to Order to Show Cause; ORDER REQUIRING Defense Counsel to Serve This Order on Defendant Lockard and File Proof of Service, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/19/2015. Show Cause Response Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER Denying as Moot Plaintiff's 91 Motion to Compel Filed on December 3, 2014 and 120 Motion for Ruling Filed on April 10, 2015 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 07/09/2015. (Flores, E)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER ADOPTING 123 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 89 Motion for Substitution, or in the Alternative, for Leave to Serve Process upon Defendant Torres' Legal Representative; ORDER Denying 94 Motion to Strike; ORDER Dismissing Defendant Torres from this Action, with Prejudice; ORDER Dismissing Plaintiff's Medical Claim from this Action signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 07/07/2015. (Flores, E)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motions For Extension Of Time Nunc Pro Tunc (Docs. 101 , 103 ; also resolves Doc. 119 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/4/2015. (Fahrney, E)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER DENYING 116 Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant Lockard signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/2/2015. (Jessen, A)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 123 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Plaintiff's 89 117 Motion for Substitution be Denied, Defendants' 94 Motion to Strike be Denied, Defendant Torres be Dismissed from this Action with Prejudice, and Plaintiff's Medical Claim be Dismissed from this Action; Objections, if any, Due within Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/27/2015. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 6/29/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 112 Request; ORDER Requiring Defendants to Notify Court Whether a Settlement Conference Would be Beneficial signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 03/10/2015. (Flores, E)
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Denying Motions as Moot 75 , 76 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/8/14. (Verduzco, M)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER denying Motion to Compel (Doc. 60 ), ORDER Granting Plaintiff Leave To Re-Serve Interrogatory No. 1 Of Plaintiff's Interrogatories, Set Two, Upon Defendants For Further Response, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/2/2014. (Fahrney, E)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 58 Request for Leave to Propound Additional Interrogatories Upon Defendant Lockhard signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/27/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Fifth 61 Motion for Substitution, without Prejudice; ORDER Granting Plaintiff Further Leave to Conduct Discovery for Limited Purpose, and to Serve Additional Interrogatories for Limited Purpose, as Discussed by this Order signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 07/25/2014. (Flores, E)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 42 Request for Leave to Propound Additional Interrogatories Upon Defendant Lopez, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/16/2014. (Marrujo, C)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting 50 Request to Withdraw Motion; ORDER Withdrawing 49 Motion for Issuance of Second Order Directing Service from Court's Calendar signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 06/03/2014. (Flores, E)
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Fourth Motion For Substitution, Without Prejudice (Doc. 43 ), ORDER Granting Discovery For Limited Purpose, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/20/2014. (Fahrney, E)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend 37 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/19/14. (Hellings, J)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Denying Motion As Moot (Doc. 34 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/19/2014. (Fahrney, E)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 33 Request for Scheduling Order; ORDER Directing Clerk to Issue Scheduling Order in this Action signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 04/24/2014. (Flores, E)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Third Motion for Substitution 31 , without Prejudice to Renewal of the Motion, as Instructed by this Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/17/14. (Verduzco, M)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Second Motion for Substitution 28 , Without Prejudice to Renewal of the Motion Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 03/21/14. (Gonzalez, R)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 25 Motion for Substitution, Without Prejudice to Renewal of the Motion Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/6/2014. Thirty Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING 14 Motion for Reconsideration; ORDER for Plaintiff to Comply With October 11, 2013 13 Screening Order by Either: (1) Filing a Second Amended Complaint Not Exceeding Twenty-Five Pages, OR (2) Notifying the Court of His Willingness to Proceed Only on the Claims Found Cognizable by the Court, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/1/2013. Thirty-Day Deadline to File Second Amended Complaint OR Notify Court of Willingness to Proceed. (Marrujo, C)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING Motions for Court to Order Immediate Service and Set Pretrial Deadlines 4 , 9 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/20/13. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilmore v. Augustus, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. Dwayne Gilmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Augustus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. S. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Lockard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Hightower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. J. Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Serna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Ismat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I. Bari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z. Nartume
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?