McCoy v. Kelso, et al.
Plaintiff: Joseph Raymond McCoy
Defendant: J. Clark Kelso, Ken Clark, A. Enenmoh, Angel Gonzales and C. Stronach
Case Number: 1:2012cv00983
Filed: June 19, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Gerald B. Cohn
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 280 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' 267 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/03/2021. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due within Twenty-One Days. (Flores, E)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER DENYING 272 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration and Disqualification signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/15/2021. (Jessen, A)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTIONSFOR RECONSIDERATION 238 AND 239 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/15/2020. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER GRANTING 257 Defendants' Motion to Extend the Dispositive Motion Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/1/2020. Dispositive motion deadline is EXTENDED to 10/14/2020. (Rivera, O)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER DENYING 252 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/16/2020. (Lundstrom, T)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS FOR RECONSIDERATION signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/02/2020. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Plaintiff's three motions for reconsideration (Doc. Nos. 192 , 238 , and 239 ) are all DENIED. (Gonzales, V)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 248 Motion to Stay Proceedings, and GRANTING GRANTING 249 Parties Extension of Time to File a Dispositive Motion, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/31/2020. (Dispositive Motions Deadline Extended to 9/30/2020). (Marrujo, C)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER ADOPTING 225 Findings and Recommendations and DENYING Plaintiff's 240 219 Motions for Temporary Restraining Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/10/2020. (Sant Agata, S)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER GRANTING 243 Plaintiff's Fourth Motion to Extend the Dispositive Motion Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/7/2020. Dispositive Motions filed by 8/31/2020. (Jessen, A)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 242 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 241 Motion for TRO be denied signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/22/2020. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R's due within 14-Days.(Lundstrom, T)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER DENYING 228 Plaintiff's Motion for Relief Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 8(b)(6), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/26/2020. (Marrujo, C)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER DENYING 232 Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Expert Witness, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/26/2020. (Marrujo, C)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 225 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Plaintiff's 219 Motion for TRO be Denied, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/19/2020. Objections to F&R due within FOURTEEN DAYS. (Marrujo, C)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER GRANTING 217 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend the Dispositive Motion Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/7/2020. Dispositive Motions filed by 6/29/2020. (Jessen, A)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER Directing Defendants to File a Response to 219 Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order Within Ten Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/6/2020. (Rivera, O)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER DENYING 212 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's March 2, 2020 Order Denying Request for Appointment of Counsel signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/30/2020. (Rivera, O)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER GRANTING 211 & 215 Plaintiff's and Defendants' Motions to Modify the Discovery and Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/13/2020. Dispositive Motions filed by 5/15/2020. (Jessen, A)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER DENYING 209 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel, Without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/19/2020. (Jessen, A)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 159 Motion for Reconsideration, Filed on September 13, 2019 signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/23/2020. (Sant Agata, S)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 206 Motion to Modify the Discovery and Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/30/2019. (Dispositive Motions filed by 3/16/2020)(Orozco, A)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER DENYING 191 Plaintiff's Motion for Change of Venue signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/17/2019. (Jessen, A)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 181 Motion for Disqualification signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/8/2019. (Orozco, A)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Conduct Depositions by Written Questions 171 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/7/2019. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 170 Motion to Stay the Amended Scheduling Order Pending Resolution of the Application for Order of Enforcement of Administrative Agency Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/7/19. (Marrujo, C)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 168 Motion for an Order Compelling Disclosure or Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/29/19. (Marrujo, C)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER DENYING 161 Plaintiff's Request for Subpoenas signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/21/2019. (Jessen, A)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER DENYING 153 Plaintiff's Motion for Court Order for Limited Admissibility, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/16/19. (Marrujo, C)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's 171 Request to Extend the Discovery Deadline to take Plaintiff's Deposition signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/8/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER DENYING 150 Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/4/2019. (Jessen, A)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER SETTING Informal Telephonic Discovery Conference Regarding Plaintiff's Unfiled Motion for Protective Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/24/2019. Telephonic Discovery Conference set for 10/7/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Sant Agata, S)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 146 Motion to Compel, Filed August 2, 2019 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/10/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 145 Motion to Compel, Filed July 15, 2019 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/10/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 145 Motion to Compel, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/21/2019. (Martin-Gill, S)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER adopting FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, denying Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and denying Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration 133 , 134 , 135 signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/11/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER DENYING 142 Plaintiff's Fifth Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/17/2019. (Jessen, A)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 139 Motion for Subpoena, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/3/19. (Marrujo, C)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 136 & 137 Motions for Subpoenas, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/23/19. (Marrujo, C)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 134 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Plaintiff's 133 Motion for Preliminary injunction and Declaratory Relief be Denied signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/16/2019. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due within Fourteen (14) Days. (Sant Agata, S)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 131 Motion to Appoint Counsel, without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/8/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER directing Judgment in favor of Plaintiff on Exhaustion of Administrative Remedies; AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/24/2019. (Discovery due by 10/2/2019. Dispositive Motions filed by 12/2/2019). (Lundstrom, T)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER STRIKING Plaintiff's Motions 120 , 121 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/13/15: The motions are STRICKEN from the record. (Hellings, J)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER Disregarding Plaintiff's Motion For Reconsideration By Chief Judge (Document 114 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/27/2015. (Fahrney, E)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER denying 111 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/7/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER denying 110 Motion for New Trial signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/6/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion To File Surreply (Document 96 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/27/2015. (Fahrney, E)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER STRIKING Plaintiff's 92 Criminal Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/22/2015. (Marrujo, C)
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Granting Defendants' Third 86 Request for Extension of Time to Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 04/07/2015. (Flores, E)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER DENYING 80 Motion to Enforce Protective Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 02/22/2015. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 68 Motion for Protective Order and STAYING Merits-Based Discovery; ORDER DENYING Defendants' 70 Motion for Extension of Time as MOOT signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/2/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 66 Motion to Strike, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/13/2014. (Marrujo, C)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Denying Defendants' Motion For Reconsideration (Document 56 ), signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/29/2014. (Fahrney, E)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's 49 Motion for Injunctive Relief, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/25/14, referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DENYING 48 Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/14/2014. (Marrujo, C)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER ADOPTING 47 Findings and Recommendations and DENYING 37 Motion to Revoke Plaintiff's In Forma Pauperis Status, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/22/2014. Responsive Pleading Due Within Fifteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendants' Motion to Revoke Plaintiff's In Forma Pauperis be DENIED; Defendants be REQUIRED to File a Responsive Pleading within fifteen (15) Days after Adoption of these Findings and Recommendations re 37 MOTION ; referred to Judge Ishii,signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 06/3/2014. Objections to F&R due by 7/10/2014 (Martin-Gill, S)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DENYING 44 Motion to Appoint Counsel,without prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 06/2/14. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER ADOPTING 28 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and ORDER DENYING 24 Plaintiff' Motion for Injunctive Relief signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/20/2014. (Jessen, A)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 32 Request to Withdraw Motion to Amend signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/19/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Regarding 27 Plaintiff's Motion to File Supplemental Pleading and Directing Plaintiff to Clarify Willingness to Proceed on Cognizable Claims Within Twenty-One (21) Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/4/2014. (Jessen, A)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal Of Certain Claims And Defendants (Doc. 17 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/8/2014. F&R's referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 2/13/2014. (Fahrney, E)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Denying Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (Document# 19 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/6/2014. (Fahrney, E)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER VACATING 7 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss for Failure to Prosecute signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 11/6/2012. (Jessen, A)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Action, without Prejudice, for Failure to Prosecute, signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 9/18/12. Referred to Judge Ishii; 15-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCoy v. Kelso, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Raymond McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Clark Kelso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Enenmoh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angel Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Stronach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?