Miller v. Akanno et al
Plaintiff: Gerald L. Miller
Defendant: J. Akanno, Lab Techician Japee, California Correctional Health Care Services and L.D. Zamora
Case Number: 1:2012cv01013
Filed: June 22, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 NOTICE AND ORDER that Plaintiff, Gerald L. Miller is no longer needed as a witness in these proceedings and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is discharged re 75 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/19/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 76 Motion in Limine; ORDER DENYING 77 Motion for Sanctions; ORDER AMENDING Pretrial Order Deadlines, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 07/30/2015. (Martin-Gill, S)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS Ad Testificandum To Transport Inmate Gerald Lee Miller, CDCR# C-92075, Date: August 19, 2015, Time: 8:00 a.m., Courtroom: 4 (LJO), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/23/2015. (Fahrney, E)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER DENYING Defendant's 66 Motion for Modification of Scheduling Order to File Motion for Summary Judgment, With Prejudice signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/18/2015. (Marrujo, C)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Pay Expenses Incurred in the Amount of $467.50 and Staying Order in Light of Plaintiff's Indigency signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 03/31/2015. (Flores, E)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S SECOND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION, WITH PREJUDICE re 56 and THIRTY-DAY DEADLINE TO OPPOSE NOTICE OF REASONABLE EXPENSES re 39 , 40 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/16/2015. (Filing Deadline: 2/18/2015).(Lundstrom, T)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER denying motion for reconsideration 57 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/15/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER STRIKING Unsigned Filings signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/8/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Adopting 38 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS' and DENYING Plaintiff's 29 Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/3/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Reconsideration, With Prejudice (Doc. 42 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/20/2014. (Fahrney, E)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DENYING 33 Motion to Compeland REQUIRING Defendant to File Notice of Reasonable Expenses Incurred Within Twenty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/1/2014. (Marrujo, C)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING 9 10 Motion for Leave to Amend as MOOT and DIRECTING Clerk's Office to FILE 11 Lodged Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/23/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER STRIKING Unsigned Complaint and Requiring Plaintiff to File Signed Complaint Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/25/2012. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Akanno et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald L. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Akanno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lab Techician Japee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Correctional Health Care Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.D. Zamora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?