Gundy v. California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation, et al
Plaintiff: Taylor Gundy
Defendant: California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation, Elaine Bush, Martin Biter and Sherry Lopez
Case Number: 1:2012cv01020
Filed: June 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 156 JUDGMENT dated *5/29/2014*. (Sant Agata, S)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER AMENDING Pretrial and TRIAL Deadlines: JURY TRIAL (3-4 days) set for June 9, 2014 (was 6/3/2014) at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. RESET MOTIONS-in-LIMINE HEARING as to (Docs. 105, 113-117, 119-123) for May 21, 2014 (was 5/19/2014) at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/15/2014. (Herman, H)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER DENYING (1) CROSS-MOTIONS TO STRIKE, and (2) DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (ECF Nos. 90,93,96) signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on April 29, 2014. (Munoz, I)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Reassigning Case to District Judge and Retaining all Pending Deadlines; ORDERED that all pending deadlines in this case, including May 1, 2014 pretrial conference and June 3, 2014 trial date, shall remain unchanged as to date and time; Both the pretrial conference and trial are RESET before Judge O'Neill and will take place in Courtroom 4, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 03/24/14. (Martin-Gill, S)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANTS: Sherry Lopez, M.D. and Adriana Arambula, WITH PREJUDICE, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 02/18/2014. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Amend First Amended Complaint 62 , 65 ; ORDER Modifying Scheduling Order 45 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/27/14. (Gonzalez, R)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice and ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/22/14. Christopher Horton (in his individual capacity) terminated. (Gonzalez, R)
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Plaintiff Taylor Gundy's Order to Dismiss Defendants Young Nam Paik, M.D. and Pacific Orthopedic Medical Group with Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/30/2013. (Yu, L)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Granting Defendant's California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation and Cate's Motion to Dismiss (Ecf Nos. 15 and 27) Matter is referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due within Fourteen (14) Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 03/20/2013. (Yu, L)
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER RE: CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT, Defendant's Consent or Decline due by 3/15/2013. signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/6/2013. (Yu, L)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER ADOPTING 34 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and ORDER GRANTING 15 and 27 Defendants' Motions for Partial Dismissal signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/1/2013. Defendant CDCR is dismissed from this action. (Jessen, A)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS that Defendants' Motions for Partial Dismissal be Granted re 15 , 27 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/8/13. Objections Due Within Fourteen (14) Days. Referred to Judge O'Neill. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gundy v. California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Gundy
Represented By: Bahar Dejban
Represented By: Shawn Khorrami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Biter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?