Felton v. Lopez, et al.
Plaintiff: Kelvin Felton
Defendant: J. Lopez and S. Harrison
Case Number: 1:2012cv01066
Filed: June 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION for Plaintiff's Failure to Prosecute signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 09/29/2015. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Denying 72 Request for Application of Non-Prisoner Provisions in Local Rules, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/10/15. (Verduzco, M)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING 69 Motion for Screening Order; ORDER GRANTING Extension of Time to File Response to First Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/6/2015. (Marrujo, C)
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER ADOPTING 61 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER Granting in Part Defendant Lopez's 38 Motion to Dismiss Supplemental Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, or Based on Qualified Immunity, with Leave to Amend; ORDER Denying Defenda nt Lopez's Motion to Strike Exhibits from Original Complaint; ORDER for Clerk to File First Amended Complaint Lodged on February 17, 2015; ORDER for Defendants Lopez and Harrison to File Answer to First Amended Complaint within Thirty Days signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 03/05/2015. (Flores, E)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER ADOPTING 58 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER Denying Defendant Lopez's 50 Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Failure to Exhaust Remedies for Claims in Supplemental Complaint signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 03/03/2015. (Flores, E)
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Denying Motion To Modify Scheduling Order As Moot (Doc. 57 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/5/2015. (Fahrney, E)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Denying 59 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 01/29/2015. (Flores, E)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Defendant's Rule 12(b)(6) 38 Motion to Dismiss Supplemental Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, or Based on Qualified Immunity, be Granted in Part, with Leave to Amend; and that Defendant's Motion to Strike be Denied signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 01/27/2015. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 3/2/2015.(Flores, E)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Defendant Lopez's 50 Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Failure to Exhaust Claims in Supplemental Complaint be Denied, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 01/23/15. Objections, If Any, Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER denying 48 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/24/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DENYING 26 Motion to Find Defendant in Contempt of Court signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/2/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Denying 24 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/2/13. (Gonzalez, R)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Vacating Order Directing Service; ORDER for Clerk to Serve a Copy of this Order on the Marshals Service in Sacramento signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 04/22/2013. (Flores, E)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING 19 Motion to Amend the Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 04/03/2013.(30) Day Deadline (Martin-Gill, S)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DENYING 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; ORDER ADOPTING 13 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 03/21/2013. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Denying 16 Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint, Without Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/18/13. (Gonzalez, R)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending That Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Injunction Be DENIED (Doc. 3 ), Objections, If Any, Due Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/12/2013. F&R's referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 3/18/2013. (Fahrney, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Felton v. Lopez, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelvin Felton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?