Blacher v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Marlon Blacher
Defendant: S. Johnson and R. Davis
Case Number: 1:2012cv01159
Filed: July 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 181 Motion Requesting Transcripts at Government Expense, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/13/19. (Gonzalez, R)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER REGARDING In Forma Pauperis Status on Appeal and DIRECTING Clerk to Serve a Copy of this Order on the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/6/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 172 173 Motions signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 01/07/2019. (Flores, E)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 160 161 162 166 167 Motions/Requests for Relief signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/10/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/22/2018 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Marlon Blancher to participate in a telephonic conference call at 10:00 a.m. on 4/3/2018 before Magi strate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. Custodian is ordered to notify the Court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian. (cc: IT Dept and CKD) (Henshaw, R)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER Directing the Clerk of Court to Close the Case 151 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/16/2018: In light of the parties' stipulation, this action has been terminated, Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), and has been dismissed with prejudice and without an award of costs or attorneys' fees. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport Marlon Blacher, CDCR# G50077, Plaintiff's Witness, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/20/18. (Marrujo, C)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/25/2018: Settlement Conference set for 3/29/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman.. (Hellings, J)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER Appointing Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/5/2017. Attorney Milton Greg Mullanax added for Marlon Blacher. (Sant Agata, S)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER DENYING 121 Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Sur-Reply and ORDER DENYING 106 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/7/2017. (Jessen, A)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 124 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/5/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 123 Motion for Appoint of Pro Bono Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 09/5/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Resubmit Declaration 114 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/29/17: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 112 113 Motions for Reconsideration signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/29/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to File Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment within Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/20/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 100 Motion for Change of Venue and Petition for Full Disclosure, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/19/17. (Gonzalez, R)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER Denying as Moot Plaintiff's 97 Motion for Relief from Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 05/01/2017. (Flores, E)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER Discharging Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum as to Inmate Marlon Blacher, CDCR #G-5007, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/18/17. (Hellings, J)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER denying 89 Motion to amend Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/23/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Formal 87 Request for Full Disclosure Concerning Experts Without Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/14/17. (Marrujo, C)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport Marlon Blacher, CDC# G-50077, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/9/17. (Marrujo, C)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and Giving Plaintiff Leave to Propound a Limited Discovery Request After the Non-Expert Discovery Period 80 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/10/17: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 48 Motion for Summary Judgment Without Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/27/16. (Marrujo, C)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 73 Motion to Alter/Amend Judgment/Order/Decree, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/21/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Following Initial Scheduling Conference; ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Compel re 64 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/2/16. (Gonzalez, R)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER on Plaintiff's 66 Petition for Reissuance of all Details Concerning Initial Disclosures/Relief from any Unintended Default signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/31/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 61 Notice Concerning Present and Undue State Imposed Disability and Motion for Adequate-Just Relief, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/21/16. (Gonzalez, R)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Denying 50 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER Denying 55 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/17/16. (Gonzalez, R)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER for Defendant Johnson to File Answer or other Responsive Pleading within Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 07/01/2016. (Flores, E)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Denying Motion For Reconsideration And Resolving Motion For Clarification (Docs. 31 , 32 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/27/2014. (Fahrney, E)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust 24 ; ORDER Dismissing this Action, without Prejudice; ORDER for Clerk to Close Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/25/14. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
October 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING Motion for Reconsideration 8 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/2/12. (Hellings, J)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING 1 Action for Failure to State a Claim upon which Relief could be Granted signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/7/2012. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blacher v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlon Blacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?