Baldhosky v. Hubbard et al
Plaintiff: Raymond Baldhosky
Defendant: Susan Hubbard, Darrel Adams, J. Wang, Edgar Clark, Vidal Sanchez, Arvindra Brar, Wayne Ulit, Julian Kim, Rajendra Dwivedi and Shakir Shabbir
Case Number: 1:2012cv01200
Filed: July 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER ATTACHING Jury Instructions; OBJECTIONS Due by Friday December 6, 2019, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 12/04/2019. (Orozco, A)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER assigning action to U.S. Magistrate Judge for all purposes pursuant to the consent of all parties signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/9/2019. New Case No. 1:12-cv-01200-JDP-(PC). (Lundstrom, T)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 234 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER RE DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE (ECF No. 200) signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on August 23, 2019. (Munoz, I)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER adopting 179 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Defendants' Motion for partial Summary Judgment be denied signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/29/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER regarding settlement conference procedures signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/20/2019. (Rooney, M)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 179 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS That Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment be Denied, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 5/6/19. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 165 STIPULATION and ORDER to Modify Scheduling Order to Extend Expert-Related Deadlines by Seven Days signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 10/9/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER Modifying the Schedule, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/23/2018: Non-Expert Discovery due 6/14/2018; Expert Disclosure due June 29, 2018; Rebuttal Expert Disclosure due July 13, 2018; Expert Discovery due August 3, 2018; Non-Dispo. Motion Filing due September 7, 2018; Dispositive Motion Filing due October 5, 2018; Pre-Trial Conference set for June 27, 2019; and Trial set for August 27, 2019. (Hellings, J)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DISMISSING Non-Cognizable Claims 28 , 126 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/20/2018. (Hellings, J)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER extending Discovery and Scheduling Order to Defendant, Idendi signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/29/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER extending applicability of Discovery and Scheduling Order to Defendants Ruff and Dunn 86 , 101 signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/4/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION and ORDER Modifying the Court's Discovery and Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/11/2017. Dispositive Motions filed by 8/3/2018. (Jessen, A)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to dismiss non-cognizable claims re 28 signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/1/2017. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER EXTENDING Discovery and Scheduling Order and Trial Scheduling Order to Defendant Nguyen signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/2/2017. (Jessen, A)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 75 Motion to Quash Subpoena, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 05/05/2017. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 DECISION and ORDER Adopting 65 Findings and Recommendations Denying Defendants' 40 Motion to Dismiss; signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/11/17. (Gonzalez, R)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER denying 74 Motion for Extension of Time signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/4/2017. (Response to Complaint due within 7-Days). (Lundstrom, T)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER GRANTING Oral Motion for Issuance of Subpoena Duces Tecum 66 ; ORDER DIRECTING Personal Service of Subpoena Duces Tecum by United States Marshals Service without Prepayment of Costs on California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Office of the Secretary, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 02/03/2017.(Case Management Deadline: 20-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny Defendants' Motions to Dismiss re 40 , 53 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/5/17. 14-Day Deadline. Referred to Judge O'Neill. (Gonzalez, R)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Granting 55 Motion to Quash Waiver of Service on Defendant Nguyen, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/5/16. (Gonzalez, R)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Denying Motion for Order to Serve Defendants by Substitution of Service 36 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/27/16. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/22/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. (Verduzco, M)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DISCHARGING Order to Show Cause; ORDER SETTING Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; Opposition Due Within Thirty Days; Reply Due Seven Days Thereafter, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/26/16. (Marrujo, C)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 19 Motion to File Amended Pleading; ORDER Directing Clerk to File Lodged 23 Second Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 05/08/14. (Gonzalez, R)
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Issuance of Summons 17 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/16/14. (Verduzco, M)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 10 Motion for Status; A date for Screening; and Issuance of Summons, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 06/09/2013. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Denying Without Prejudice Plaintiff's Motion For Permission For Electronic Case Filing (ECF No. 7 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/3/2012. (Fahrney, E)
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting 3 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/25/12. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baldhosky v. Hubbard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Baldhosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrel Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgar Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vidal Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arvindra Brar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Ulit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julian Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rajendra Dwivedi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shakir Shabbir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?