United States for the use of Hajoca Corporation v. Aeroplate Corporation, et al.
Plaintiff: United States for the use of Hajoca Corporation
Defendant: Aeroplate Corporation, Mary Williams and Ronald D. Patterson
Case Number: 1:2012cv01287
Filed: August 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER to Appear for Examination, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/30/13. Judgment Debtor Exam set for 11/1/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Gonzalez, R)
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default Judgment, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/15/13. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment [Docs. 28, 31]. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due within 15 days of service of this recommendation. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/11/2013. (Herman, H)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER to File Supplemental Briefing: to Plaintiff's motion for default judgment, no later than 5/28/2013. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/13/2013. (Herman, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States for the use of Hajoca Corporation v. Aeroplate Corporation, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States for the use of Hajoca Corporation
Represented By: Eli J. Karpeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aeroplate Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald D. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?