Miller v. Najera, et. al.
Plaintiff: Steven R. Miller
Defendant: Albert Najera, County of Fresno, Margaret Mims, Rick Hill and Fresno County Department of Public Health
Case Number: 1:2012cv01288
Filed: July 30, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Santa Barbara
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration 94 signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/15/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER GRANTING Motions for Summary Judgment 68 , 70 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/21/2017: (1) Defendant Najera's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED; and (2) Plaintiff's claim against the County Defendants is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.The trial scheduled for March 20, 2018, and all associated deadlines are VACATED. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE.(Hellings, J)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 84 Motion for Leave to Defend Supervisory Claims and GRANTING Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Reply 85 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/5/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 76 Request for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/22/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Memorandum Decision and ORDER DENYING 72 Request for Deposition, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/19/17. (Marrujo, C)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION 65 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/6/2017. (Kusamura, W)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER RE MOTION TO COMPEL AND MISCELLANEOUS REQUESTS 61 signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/4/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER DENYING 61 Motion to Compel, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 08/2/2017. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Produce Steven R. Miller, #65070-097, via Telephonic Conference Call on May 18, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/3/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING In Part and DENYING In Part Plaintiff's 15 Motion for Status and Suggested Course of Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/18/2013. (Marrujo, C)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motions for (1) Reconsideration of Denial of in Forma Pauperis Status 12 , (2) in Forma Pauperis 13 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 5/6/13. (Verduzco, M)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING as MOOT Plaintiff's 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/29/2013. (Marrujo, C)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Denying Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (ECF No. 8 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/7/2012. (Fahrney, E)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:12-cv-1982 DAD PC) to Fresno (1:12-cv-1288 MJS PC) signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/7/2012; this court has not ruled on plaintiff's request to proceed ifp. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Najera, et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven R. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Najera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Fresno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresno County Department of Public Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?