Crim v. Management & Training Corp. et al
Plaintiff: John Michael Crim
Defendant: Management & Training Corp., Neil Hamilton Adler, Tiarra Stewart, Cynthia Mann, Dale Patrick, Curtis Logan, Dennis McBride and Kwonto Sy
Case Number: 1:2012cv01340
Filed: August 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that this 1 Case be Dismissed for Plaintiff's Failure to Comply with Court Order; Objections Due within 14 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/28/2017. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 7/17/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER for Plaintiff to Either: (1) Respond in Writing That He Intends to Litigate This Case, OR (2) File a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of This Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/8/17. Ten Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's 35 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; ORDER for Clerkt to Forward Plaintiff's Application to the Ninth Circuit, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/29/14. (Gonzalez, R)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER ADOPTING 25 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER Dismissing Action, with Prejudice, for Failure to State a Claim upon which Relief may be Granted; ORDER that Dismissal is Subject to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(g) signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/25/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Flores, E)
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss This Action, With Prejudice, for Failure to State a Claim, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/30/14. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections, If Any, Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Second Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Screening Order, With Prejudice 23 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/3/14. (Hellings, J)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Denying Motion for Reconsideration 21 ; ORDER for Plaintiff to Comply with November 19, 2013 Screening Order 20 ; ORDER Granting Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/16/13. 30-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ADOPTING 15 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Remand signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 03/21/2013. (Flores, E)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATION, Recommending That Plaintiff's Motion For Remand Be Denied, (Doc. 10 ), Objections, If Any, Due In 30 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/22/2013. F&R's referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 2/25/2013. (Fahrney, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crim v. Management & Training Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Michael Crim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Management & Training Corp.
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Robert Andrew Ford
Represented By: Dale Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Hamilton Adler
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Robert Andrew Ford
Represented By: Dale Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiarra Stewart
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Robert Andrew Ford
Represented By: Dale Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Mann
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Robert Andrew Ford
Represented By: Dale Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Patrick
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Robert Andrew Ford
Represented By: Dale Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Logan
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Robert Andrew Ford
Represented By: Dale Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis McBride
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Robert Andrew Ford
Represented By: Dale Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kwonto Sy
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Robert Andrew Ford
Represented By: Dale Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?