Kristine Livingston et al v. Kempersports Management, Inc.
Plaintiff: Izaak Mark Livingston, Jason Alan Livingston, Kristine Livingston and Wesley Alexander Livingston
Defendant: Kempersports Management, Inc. and Ridge Creek Dinuba Golf Club
Case Number: 1:2012cv01427
Filed: August 30, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER DISMISSING Plaintiff's Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/23/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
October 10, 2014 Filing 74 DECLARATION of DEAN B. GORDON. (Gordon, Dean)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** Pursuant to the declarations filed by the parties' counsel, the parties are permitted additional time to file final dispositional documents. Final dispositional documents shall be filed by December 29, 2014. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/25/2014. (Timken, A)
September 24, 2014 Filing 72 DECLARATION of Matthew J. Mason. (Mason, Matthew)
September 23, 2014 Filing 71 DECLARATION of DEAN B. GORDON. (Gordon, Dean)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING #69 the Application for Minor's Compromise of Izaak Mark Livingston. The parties' final dismissal documents shall be filed no later than September 22, 2014. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/28/2014. (Timken, A)
August 13, 2014 Filing 69 MOTION ORDER APPROVING MINOR'S COMPROMISE by Izaak Mark Livingston. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DEAN B. GORDON)(Gordon, Dean)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, which was approved and ordered by the Court on June 13, 2014, an application for approval to compromise the claim of Izaak Mark Livingston was to be filed within two weeks by Plaintiffs' counsel. No application for approval of a minor's compromise has been filed. By no later than August 15, 2014, Plaintiff Izaak Mark Livingston, through and by his guardian ad litem Kristine Livingston, shall file an application to compromise his claims pursuant to the parties' settlement. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/29/2014. (Timken, A)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION And ORDER Dismissing Claims Of Plaintiffs Kristine Livingston, Jason Alan Livingston, And Wesley Alexander Livingston With Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/12/2014. CASE CLOSED.(Fahrney, E)
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MINUTE ORDER: The docket indicates that you docketed a proposed order, #65 , however you failed to also send it to Judge Oberto's order box so it could be signed. Please submit the document in Word format to skoorders@caed.uscourts.gov. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/11/2014. (Timken, A)
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS KRISTINE LIVINGSTON, JASON ALAN LIVINGSTON, AND WESLEY ALEXANDER LIVINGSTON WITH PREJUDICE by Kristine Livingston. (Gordon, Dean)
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTE ORDER: (Text Entry Only) A #63 Notice of Settlement has been filed in this matter. All future hearing dates have been ORDERED VACATED and a stipulation re dismissal shall be filed no later than 6/10/2014. If not received, the Court may dismiss the matter on its own authority. Minute Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/12/2014. (Gaumnitz, R)
May 9, 2014 Filing 63 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT (JOINT) by Kempersports Management, Inc.. (Mason, Matthew)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 CONSENT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE for all purposes to Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 05/08/14. The New Case Number is 1:12-cv-01427-SKO. (Gonzalez, R)
May 6, 2014 Filing 61 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Kempersports Management, Inc. (Hellings, J)
May 6, 2014 Filing 60 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Izaak Mark Livingston, Jason Alan Livingston, Kristine Livingston, Wesley Alexander Livingston. (Hellings, J)
May 6, 2014 Filing 59 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held on 5/6/2014; CASE SETTLED. The terms of the settlement were put forth on the record. The notice of settlement shall be filed by 5/8/2014. The motion for summary judgment set for 5/15/2014, the pretrial conference set for 9/4/2014, and the trial set for 10/21/2014, are VACATED. Plaintiffs' Counsel Dean Gordon present. Defendant's Counsel Michael Burns present. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO. (Timken, A)
May 1, 2014 Filing 58 OPPOSITION by Izaak Mark Livingston, Jason Alan Livingston, Kristine Livingston, Wesley Alexander Livingston to #55 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: #1 PLAINTIFFS' MATERIAL FACTS, #2 Declaration DBG DECLARATION, #3 Exhibit EXHIBITS A-C, #4 Exhibit EXHIBITS D-E)(Gordon, Dean)
April 29, 2014 Filing 57 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF DEFENDANT'S CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT by Kempersports Management, Inc.. (Mason, Matthew)
April 21, 2014 Filing 56 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto: TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE re the 5/6/2014, Settlement Conference held on 4/21/2014, in chambers and off the record. The Settlement Conference set for 5/6/2014, remains as previously set. Plaintiffs' Counsel Dean Gordon, telephonically present. Defendant's Counsel Michael Burns and Matthew Mason, telephonically present. Court Reporter/CD Number: In Chambers. (Timken, A)
April 17, 2014 Filing 55 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Kempersports Management, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/15/2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Attachments: #1 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, #2 JOINT STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS, #3 DECLARATION OF STEVE ARGO, #4 DECLARATION OF ART CERVANTEZ, #5 DECLARATION OF KEN FELKER, #6 DECLARATION OF ROBBIE LOMELI, #7 DECLARATION OF SUSAN SOMMERS-EVANS, #8 DECLARATION OF BOB TILLEMA, #9 DECLARATION OF TERESA TILLEMA, #10 DECLARATION OF JOSEPH WISOCKI, #11 DECLARATION OF MATTHEW J. MASON, #12 EXHIBITS A-B TO MATTHEW J. MASON DECLARATION, #13 EXHIBITS C-D TO MATTHEW J. MASON DECLARATION, #14 EXHIBITS E-J TO MATTHEW J. MASON DECLARATION, #15 [PROPOSED] ORDER)(Mason, Matthew)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** A TELEPHONIC Conference re the 5/6/2014, Settlement Conference is set for 4/21/2014, at 04:45 PM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties shall coordinate a conference call and call the Court at 559-499-5790 at the appointment time. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/17/2014. (Timken, A)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER re SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/14/2014. (Timken, A)
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION and ORDER Regarding Plaintiffs' Voluntary Dismissal of Claims signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/10/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
April 10, 2014 Filing 51 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for PLAINTIFFS' VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS by Kempersports Management, Inc.. (Mason, Matthew)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION and ORDER Regarding Non-Expert and Expert Discovery Deadlines. The Expert Disclosure Deadline is hereby continued to May 16, 2014; the Expert Discovery Deadline is hereby continued to July 16, 2014; and the Non-Expert Discovery Deadline is hereby continued until May 30, 2014, for the limited purpose of permitting Defendant to take the non-expert deposition of Dr. Grant Nakamura. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/28/2014. (Timken, A)
February 25, 2014 Filing 49 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for NON-EXPERT AND EXPERT DISCOVERY DEADLINES by Kempersports Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF MATTHEW J. MASON, #2 Declaration OF DEAN B. GORDON)(Mason, Matthew)
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** On February 11, 2014, the parties appeared for a telephonic discovery conference. Dean Gordon, Esq., appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs; Michael Burns, Esq., and Matthew Mason, Esq., appeared on behalf of Defendant. Kristine Livingston's deposition is set for February 24, 2014, and Mr. Gordon will inform Mr. Burns by noon on Friday, November 14, 2014, whether the deposition will take place in Idaho or in California. Further, the motion for reconsideration filed by Plaintiffs on February 5, 2014, was improperly noticed and thus the hearing set for February 13, 2014, on that motion has been vacated. (See Doc. 45.) To be considered by the Court, any further motion for reconsideration must be refiled and properly noticed pursuant to Local Rule 230(b). Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/12/2014. (Timken, A)
February 11, 2014 Filing 47 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto: TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY HEARING held on 2/11/2014, in chambers and off the record. The Court to issue minute order. Plaintiffs' Counsel Dean Gordon, telephonically present. Defendant's Counsel Matthew Mason and Michael Burns, telephonically present. Court Reporter/CD Number: In Chambers. (Timken, A)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** (TIME CHANGE ONLY) The informal telephonic discovery conference set for 2/11/2014, will now be heard at 05:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties shall coordinate a conference call and contact the Court at (559)-499-5790 once all parties are on the line. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/10/2014. (Timken, A)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** On February 5, 2014, Plaintiffs filed a motion for reconsideration of a discovery sanction. (Doc. 44.) This motion was set to be heard February 13, 2014, which is insufficiently noticed pursuant to the Court's Local Rule 230(b). As such, the hearing set for February 13, 2014, is VACATED. An informal telephonic discovery conference is hereby set for February 11, 2014, at 4:00 p.m. If this time is not convenient for counsel, they may contact Courtroom Deputy, Alice Timken, at 559-499-5795. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/7/2014. (Timken, A)
February 5, 2014 Filing 44 MOTION for RECONSIDERATION OF SANCTIONS ORDER PRECLUDING USE OF "TERESA TILLEMA" DECLARATION AT TRIAL by Kristine Livingston. Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B)(Gordon, Dean)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER on Parties' Discovery Dispute Following Telephone Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/24/2014. (Gaumnitz, R)
January 23, 2014 Filing 42 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto: Informal Telephonic Discovery Conference held on 1/23/2014, written order to follow. Plaintiff's Counsel D. Gordon telephonically present. Defendant's Counsel M. Burns and M. Mason telephonically present. (Gaumnitz, R)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER: (Text Entry Only) The Court has received the parties' informal statements regarding a discovery dispute. An informal telephonic discovery conference is hereby set for Thursday 1/23/2014, at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties shall initiate one conference call to the Court at (559) 499-5790 at the time and date for the conference. Minute Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/17/2014. (Gaumnitz, R)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** On December 17, 2013, an informal telephonic discovery conference was held. Dean Gordon, Esq., appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs and Michael Burns, Esq., and Matthew Mason, Esq., appeared on behalf of Defendant. The parties agreed that all privilege log issues were addressed by the parties and nothing remained outstanding. The parties have reached an agreement regarding certain writings by Mark Livingston produced by Plaintiffs in discovery; additionally, they have agreed to discuss the remaining issues with respect to certain writings by Kristine Livingston produced during discovery. Mr. Burns is to prepare a draft stipulation for Mr. Gordon's review by December 20, 2013; Mr. Gordon will address any issues in the proposed stipulation by January 3, 2014; the parties will file their stipulation by January 10, 2014. In the event the parties are unable to independently reach agreement on all terms of the stipulation, they may contact chambers regarding a further discovery conference. At this time, no further discovery conference is set, and it is recommended that the parties enjoy a safe and happy holiday season. Minute Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/18/2013. (Timken, A)
December 17, 2013 Filing 39 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto: TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held on 12/17/2013, in chambers and off the record. The Court to issue a minute order. Plaintiffs' Counsel Dean Gordon, telephonically present. Defendant's Counsel Matthew Mason and Michael Burns, telephonically present. Court Reporter/CD Number: In Chambers. (Timken, A)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** Plaintiffs' counsel has informed the Court that his trial calendar for December 17, 2013, has cleared. Therefore, the telephonic discovery conference set for December 17, 2013, will be RESET as to time only and will be held at 4:00 p.m. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/14/2013. (Timken, A)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE setting a further telephonic discovery conference for 12/17/2013 at 04:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/13/2013. (Rooney, M)
November 12, 2013 Filing 36 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto: TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY DISPUTE CONFERENCE held on 11/12/2013, in chambers and off the record. The Court to issue order. Plaintiffs' Counsel Dean Gordon, telephonically present. Defendant's Counsel Matthew Mason & Michael Burns, telephonically present. Court Reporter/CD Number: In Chambers. (Timken, A)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re Discovery Dispute. ORDER Setting Telephonic Conference for 11/12/2013, at 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties shall initiate one joint conference call at the time and date for the informal telephonic status conference. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/1/2013. (Timken, A)
October 31, 2013 Filing 34 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto: TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held on 10/31/2013, in chambers and off the record. The Court to issue written order. Plaintiffs' Counsel Dean Gordon, telephonically present. Defendant's Counsel Matthew Mason and Michael Burns, telephonically present. Court Reporter/CD Number: In Chambers. (Timken, A)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** Due to an apparent inability to meet and confer, the parties each submitted separate letter briefs to the Court regarding their outstanding discovery issues. Defendant's informal brief was received on Monday, October 21, 2013, and Plaintiffs' informal letter brief was received on October 22, 2013. According to Defendant, among other issues, Plaintiffs provided certain supplemental discovery responses on Monday, October 21, 2013. Because of late responses, Defendant asserts it was unable to evaluate some of the information provided, and the parties were unable to meet and confer to submit a joint statement. To allow Defendant sufficient time to review Plaintiffs' supplemental responses, and because some of the information Plaintiffs were to produce has not yet been provided, the October 23, 2013, telephonic conference is CONTINUED to October 31, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. The parties are ORDERED to meet and confer by no later than Monday, October 28, 2013, to consider any additional issues with respect to Plaintiffs' supplemental discovery responses that the parties have not yet discussed. A JOINT STATEMENT summarizing the outstanding issues shall be submitted via email no later than October 29, 2013. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/22/2013. (Timken, A)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER regarding #27 parties' discovery dispute; ORDER VACATING hearing set for 10/16/2013; ORDER SETTING telephonic conference for 10/23/2013, at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties should submit a joint statement of the outstanding issues to the Court via email (skoorders@caed.uscourts.gov) no later than 10/21/2013. If a further telephonic conference is not necessary, the parties may stipulate to vacating the conference set for 10/23/2013. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/9/2013. (Timken, A)
October 8, 2013 Filing 31 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto: TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY HEARING held on 10/8/2013, in chambers and off the record. The Court to issue order. Plaintiffs' Counsel Dean Gordon, telephonically present. Defendant's Counsel Matthew Mason and Michael Burns, telephonically present. Court Reporter/CD Number: In Chambers. (Timken, A)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** On Friday, September 27, 2013, the Court received the exhibits to Defendant's informal letter brief. Due to the scope of the discovery dispute, the telephonic conference set for Wednesday, October 2, 2013, is CONTINUED to October 8, 2013, at 10:00. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/30/2013. (Timken, A)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** The parties have submitted to the Court, and served on each other, informal letter briefs regarding their discovery dispute. Accordingly, an informal telephonic discovery conference will be held on October 2, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall coordinate one conference call to the Court at (559) 499-5790 at the time of the conference. Defendant's motion to compel is CONTINUED to October 16, 2013, at 9:30 a.m., to the extent that there are unresolved discovery issues following the informal telephonic discovery conference.Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/26/2013. (Timken, A)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** Please advise if the parties are willing to participate in an informal telephonic discovery dispute conference on Wednesday, October 2, 2013. If the parties wish to participate in an informal discovery dispute conference they will need to submit to us, and serve on each other, a letter brief, (no more than 5 pages), by September 25, 2013. If the parties participate in an informal discovery dispute conference and the dispute does not resolve, the motion will be heard formally on October 16, 2013. If the parties choose the informal conference, the Court asks Defendant to please submit all of the disputed interrogatories and production requests as exhibits to its letter brief and mail a courtesy copy to the Court. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/17/2013. (Timken, A)
September 4, 2013 Filing 27 MOTION to COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES; TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND INSPECTION OF TANGIBLE THINGS; TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF KRISTINE LIVINGSTON; FOR SANCTIONS by Kempersports Management, Inc.. Attorney Mason, Matthew J. added. Motion Hearing set for 10/2/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Mason, Matthew)
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER (Fed.R.Civ.P 16), Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/1/2013: Initial Disclosure Deadlines: 2/7/2013; Discovery Deadlines: Non Expert- 3/4/2014, Expert- 5/2/2014; Non-Dispositive Motion Deadline: Filing- 5/7/2014; Dispositive Motion Deadline: Filing- 6/11/2014; Settlement Conference: 5/6/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto; Pretrial Conference: 9/4/2014 at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 4 before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Jury Trial (6-10 Day Est.): 10/21/2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Arellano, S.)
January 31, 2013 Filing 25 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Kristine Livingston. (Gordon, Dean)
January 29, 2013 Filing 24 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 1/29/2013, in chambers and off the record. The Court to issue order. Plaintiffs' Counsel Dean Gordon present. Defendant's Counsel Michael Burns present. Court Reporter/CD Number: In Chambers. (Timken, A)
January 22, 2013 Filing 23 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Kempersports Management, Inc.. (Burns, Michael)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** The Scheduling Conference currently set for 1/24/2013, has been RESET for 1/29/2013, at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Telephonic appearances are appoved. The parties shall coordinate with each other one conference call to the Court at (559) 499-5790 at the appointment time. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/16/2013. (Timken, A)
November 30, 2012 Filing 21 ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Kempersports Management, Inc..(Burns, Michael)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AMENDED STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Mandatory Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/19/2012. (Initial Scheduling Conference previously set for 12/6/2012, is CONTINUED to 1/24/2013, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto.)(Gaumnitz, R)
November 19, 2012 Filing 19 STIPULATION to CONTINUE MANDATORY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Kristine Livingston. (Gordon, Dean)
November 16, 2012 Filing 18 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs by Kristine Livingston.(Gordon, Dean)
November 16, 2012 Filing 17 STIPULATION re #9 Stipulation AMENDED STIPULATION & ORDER TO CONTINUE MANDATORY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Kristine Livingston. (Gordon, Dean)
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) Pursuant to the Court's October 26, 2012 order (Doc. 15), plaintiffs' amended complaint, if any, is due within twenty-one (21) days of electronic service of this minute order signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on October 26, 2012. (Munoz, I)
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE [Docs. 5,6] signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on October 26, 2012. (Munoz, I)
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER: (Text Entry Only) signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/19/2012; The hearing on defendant Kempersports Management, Inc.'s motion to dismiss #5 set for 10/25/2012 before Judge O'Neill is VACATED, and the matter submitted on the pleadings, pursuant to Local Rule 230(g). Written order to issue. (Gaumnitz, R)
October 18, 2012 Filing 13 REPLY by Kempersports Management, Inc. re #5 MOTION to DISMISS. (Burns, Michael)
October 11, 2012 Filing 12 EXHIBIT A - Plaintiffs' Opp re #5 MOTION to DISMISS filed by Kempersports Management, Inc.. (Schwin, Kevin)
October 10, 2012 Filing 11 OPPOSITION by Kristine Livingston to #5 MOTION to DISMISS. (Gordon, Dean)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** The docket indicates that you docketed a stipulation and proposed order, #9 , however, you failed to also send it to Judge Oberto's order box so it could be signed. Please submit the document in Word or WordPerfect format to skoorders@caed.uscourts.gov. Minute Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/9/2012. (Timken, A)
October 5, 2012 Filing 9 STIPULATION & [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE MANDATORY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Kristine Livingston. (Gordon, Dean)
September 6, 2012 Filing 8 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Kempersports Management, Inc.. (Burns, Michael)
September 6, 2012 Filing 7 STATEMENT of RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Kempersports Management, Inc.. (Burns, Michael)
September 6, 2012 Filing 6 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Kempersports Management, Inc. in re #5 Motion to Dismiss,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1 TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE, #2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER RE RJN)(Burns, Michael)
September 6, 2012 Filing 5 MOTION to DISMISS by Kempersports Management, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Prop] Order re Mtn to Dismiss)(Burns, Michael)
August 30, 2012 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/6/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form) (Martin-Gill, S)
August 30, 2012 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal by Kempersports Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Michael J. Burns Declaration in Support of Removal, #2 Declaration Daniel McCloskey Declaration in Support of Removal, #3 Declaration Joseph Wisocki Declaration in Support of Removal, #4 Proof of Service Proof of Service re Removal)(Burns, Michael)
August 30, 2012 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Kempersports Management, Inc. (Burns, Michael)
August 30, 2012 RECEIPT number #CAE100019905 $350.00 fbo Kempersports Management, Inc. by SF Office Seyfarth Shaw LLP on 8/30/2012. (Verduzco, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kristine Livingston et al v. Kempersports Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Izaak Mark Livingston
Represented By: Dean B Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Alan Livingston
Represented By: Dean B Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristine Livingston
Represented By: Dean B Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Alexander Livingston
Represented By: Dean B Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kempersports Management, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J Burns
Represented By: Matthew J. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ridge Creek Dinuba Golf Club
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?