Coalition for Clean Air, Inc., et al v. VWR International, LLC
Plaintiff: Coalition for Clean Air, Inc., Center for Environmental Health, Association of Irritated Residents, Teamsters Joint Council 7 and Kevin Long
Defendant: VWR International, LLC
Case Number: 1:2012cv01569
Filed: September 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:7604 Clear Air Act (Emission Standards)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 CONSENT JUDGMENT; Order to Close this Action, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/11/13. CASE CLOSED(Martin-Gill, S)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER re 17 Motion to Dismiss ; Cross Motion for Summary Judgment 23 ; and Staying Case, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/5/2013. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on January 24, 2013. (Munoz, I)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's' 6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/8/13. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION and ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on December 13, 2012. (Munoz, I)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER CONTINUING Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 17 ), Signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/20/2012. The Motion Hearing previously set for 12/10/2012 is CONTINUED to 12/20/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Arellano, S.)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER VACATING NOVEMBER 13, 2012 HEARING AND ORDERING FURTHER BRIEFING TO COINCIDE WITH PENDING MOTION TO DISMISS signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on November 8, 2012. (Munoz, I)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ON REPLY BRIEFING PAGE LIMITS signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on November 5, 2012. (Munoz, I)
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING VWR INTERNATIONAL, LLCS REQUEST TO SEAL THE DECLARATION OF EDWARD BORGER RE: HARDSHIP IN SUPPORT OF VWR INTERNATIONAL LLCS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on October 29, 2012. E-mail Address for Approved Sealed Document (see L.R. 141): ApprovedSealed@caed.uscourts.gov (Munoz, I)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION and ORDER CONTINUING BRIEFING AND HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on October 12, 2012. Motion Hearing currently set for 10/29/2012 is CONTINUED to 11/13/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Munoz, I)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coalition for Clean Air, Inc., et al v. VWR International, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coalition for Clean Air, Inc.
Represented By: Sara Hedgpeth-Harris
Represented By: Richard Drury
Represented By: Christina Maria Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Environmental Health
Represented By: Sara Hedgpeth-Harris
Represented By: Richard Drury
Represented By: Christina Maria Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Association of Irritated Residents
Represented By: Christina Maria Caro
Represented By: Richard Drury
Represented By: Sara Hedgpeth-Harris
Represented By: Brent Joseph Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teamsters Joint Council 7
Represented By: Christina Maria Caro
Represented By: Richard Drury
Represented By: Sara Hedgpeth-Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Long
Represented By: Christina Maria Caro
Represented By: Richard Drury
Represented By: Sara Hedgpeth-Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VWR International, LLC
Represented By: Adam Johnson Thurston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?