Newman v. Bank of New York Mellon
Plaintiff: David Leroy Newman
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon
Case Number: 1:2012cv01629
Filed: October 1, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL; Dismissed in its entirety with prejudice,signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/22/18. CASE CLOSED (Martin-Gill, S)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER REGARDING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION AND ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/29/2017. (Kusamura, W)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO DENY PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND 67 signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 5/5/2017. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Objections to F&R due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Order Continuing Scheduling Conference. The Initial Scheduling Conference is now set for 8/25/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 07/01/2016. (Yu, L)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 25 Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/10/2013. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER VACATING Hearing and Taking Matter Under Submission signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/18/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER on Defendants' 8 Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/10/2013. (Plaintiff may file an amended complaint within twenty-one (21) days of service of this order and the failure to file an amended complaint within the time allotted will result in the withdrawal of leave to amend and the closure of this case without further notice.) (Gaumnitz, R)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER VACATING January 14, 2013 Hearing and Taking Matter Under Submission, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/9/13. (Martin-Gill, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newman v. Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Leroy Newman
Represented By: Malcolm D. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?