Hernandez v. Lewis
Petitioner: Jesus Cianez Hernandez
Respondent: Greg Lewis
Case Number: 1:2012cv01661
Filed: October 10, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 AMENDED FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding 15 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; Thirty Day Objection Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/17/2018. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Sant Agata, S)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER requiring parties to submit supplemental briefing signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 8/26/2017. Thirty day Filing Deadline. (Lundstrom, T)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER DENYING 76 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/25/17. (Marrujo, C)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER DECLINING TO ADOPT 72 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and ORDER REFERRING Back to the Assigned Magistrate Judge for Amended Findings and Recommendations signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/11/2017. (Jessen, A)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding 15 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/6/16. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Granting Motion to Withdraw 31 Request for Leave to File a Supplemental Brief, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/29/14. (Verduzco, M)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/30/2013 adopting 27 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and denying 24 Motion to Dismiss. Matter referred to the assigned Magistrate Judge. (Lundstrom, T)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 24 Respondent's Motion to Dismiss this Action as Time-Barred be DENIED re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 8/15/2013. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Appointing Office Of Federal Defender, Directing Counsel To File Notice Of Appearance Within Fourteen Days, And Directing Clerk Of Court To Serve Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/10/2012. (Fahrney, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jesus Cianez Hernandez
Represented By: Linnea Marie Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Greg Lewis
Represented By: Brian George Smiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?