Brown v. Miller
Petitioner: Kareem Brown
Respondent: Amy Miller
Case Number: 1:2012cv01787
Filed: November 1, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER DECLINING to Issue Certificate of Appealability signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/25/2017. (Jessen, A)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DENYING 50 Motion for Reconsideration signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/21/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER on 40 Motion for Issuance of Certificate of Appealability signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/26/2015. Court DECLINES to Issue a Certificate of Appealability. (Sant Agata, S)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting Administrative Relief 27 , 28 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/12/14. (Verduzco, M)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION Regarding 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 8/31/14. Referred to Judge Ishii; 30-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kareem Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Amy Miller
Represented By: Charles Austin French
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?