Soltero v. City of Bakersfield et al
Plaintiff: Cynthia Soltero
Defendant: City of Bakersfield, Bakersfield Police Department and Timothy Berchtold
Case Number: 1:2012cv01791
Filed: November 1, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER re Stipulation of Dismissal signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/10/2015. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER AFTER 45 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/19/2015. Stipulated motion to dismiss filing deadline: 3/20/2015. All pending dates, conferences and hearings are VACATED and any pending motions are ordered TERMINATED. (Hall, S)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING 38 Defendants City of Bakersfield, Timothy Berchtold, and Jason Felgenhauer's Motion Seeking Court Appointment of the Settlement Proceeds Pursuant to C.C.P. Section 377.61 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/10/2015. (Jessen, A)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Denying Motion For Judicial Determination Pursuant To California Code Of Civil Procedure section 382 (Doc. 35 ) And Requiring Filing And Re-Notice Of Motion Pursuant To CCP section 377.61, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/9/2014. (Fahrney, E)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Denying 29 30 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/21/2014. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re 21 Stipulation to Modify Scheduling Order and Allowing the Plaintiff to File a Third Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/6/2014. Third Amended Complaint due by 6/11/2014. Expert Discovery Deadline 10 /7/2014. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 10/22/2014; Hearing by 11/14/2014. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 11/21/2014; Hearing by 1/6/2015. Settlement Conference reset for 1/20/2015 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Pretrial Conference reset for 2/25/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Jury Trial reset for 4/21/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Hall, S)
December 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER to Vacate Hearing Date of January 10, 2013, Terminate 8 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and to File Second Amended Complaint signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/28/2012. Defendants shall file and serve papers to respond to the Second Amended Complaint by 1/23/2013. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soltero v. City of Bakersfield et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Soltero
Represented By: Daniel A Gibalevich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Bakersfield
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Virginia Anne Gennaro
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bakersfield Police Department
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Virginia Anne Gennaro
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Berchtold
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Virginia Anne Gennaro
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?