Guereca v. Benov
Petitioner: Juan Francisco Ortiz Guereca
Respondent: Michael L. Benov
Case Number: 1:2012cv01910
Filed: November 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DISMISSING PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus AS MOOT signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/2/2014. CASE CLOSED. Certificate of Appealability not required. (Jessen, A)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER for Petitioner to SHOW CAUSE Why Petition Should Not Be Dismissed as Moot, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/22/13: Thirty-Day Deadline to file Response to OSC. (Hellings, J)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Should not be Granted, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 8/29/13. Thirty-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guereca v. Benov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael L. Benov
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Dale Patrick
Represented By: Samantha Sue Spangler
Represented By: Heidi Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Juan Francisco Ortiz Guereca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?