Barboza v. Green
Plaintiff: Rumaldo Barboza
Defendant: Barry J. Green
Case Number: 1:2012cv01914
Filed: November 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this Action be DISMISSED Without Prejudice for Plaintiff's Failure to Prosecute re 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/16/2014. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within fifteen (15) days. (Jessen, A)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE AND ORDER FINDING that Plaintiff is NOT Entitled to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/12/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Adopting FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS And Denying Motion (Doc. Nos. 3 , 10 ), signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/19/2013. (Fahrney, E)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS of Dismissal for Failure to Prosecute, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/19/2013, referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/27/2013. Show Cause Response due by 9/16/2013.(Lundstrom, T)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING 4 Ex Parte Request for Defendant's Home Address signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/12/2012. (Jessen, A)
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/7/12. Referred to Judge Ishii; 14-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barboza v. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rumaldo Barboza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry J. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?