O'Brien v. Welty et al

Plaintiff: Neil O'Brien
Defendant: John Welty, Paul M. Oliaro, Carolyn V. Coon, Victor M. Torres, Maria A. Lopes, Luz Gonzalez and Matthew Jendian
Case Number: 1:2012cv02017
Filed: December 12, 2012
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Referring Judge: Stanley A Boone
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Closing Case in Light of Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice 49 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/1/16. (CASE CLOSED) (Hellings, J)
July 20, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 41 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT. The hearing set for August 1, 2016 is VACATED. The Mandatory Scheduling Conference is continued to October 17, 2016 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 9 before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/19/2016. (Hernandez, M)
May 9, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER to change response date to First Amended Complaint and to continue the Scheduling Conference from 6/20/2016 to 8/9/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. A joint scheduling report is due one week before the new conference date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/9/2016. (Hernandez, M)
May 3, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court Order setting Mandatory Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/3/2016. (Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/20/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone) (Rosales, O)
May 24, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/22/13. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
May 2, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on 27 Stipulation to Change Sheduling Conference Date, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 5/27/2013. (Initial Scheduling Conference previously set for 5/14/2013, is CONTINUED to 7/23/2013, at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone.)(Gaumnitz, R)
February 28, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING defendants' Motion to Dismiss, document 18 , currently set for hearing on 3/4/2013 before Judge Ishii. The Court has deemed the matter suitable for decision without oral argument and will take the matter under submission as of that date. Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/28/2013. (Rooney, M)
February 1, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION to change Scheduling Conference Date; ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 1/31/2013. (Scheduling Conference previously set for 2/19/2013 has been CONTINUED to 4/16/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone) (Figueroa, O)
January 16, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating January 28, 2013 Hearing and Order on Defendants' 10 Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/16/2013. (IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The January 28, 2013 hearing date is VACATED; and 2. Defendants motion to dismiss (Doc. No. 10) is DENIED as moot.)(Gaumnitz, R)
January 15, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION for Plaintiff Filing a First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 15(a)(2), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 1/14/13. (Hellings, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Brien v. Welty et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil O'Brien
Represented By: Brian C Leighton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Welty
Represented By: Molly Suzanne Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul M. Oliaro
Represented By: Molly Suzanne Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn V. Coon
Represented By: Molly Suzanne Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor M. Torres
Represented By: Molly Suzanne Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria A. Lopes
Represented By: Molly Suzanne Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luz Gonzalez
Represented By: Molly Suzanne Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Jendian
Represented By: Molly Suzanne Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?