Edison v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Edison
Defendant: United States of America, The GEO Group Inc. and Management and Training Corporation
Case Number: 1:2012cv02026
Filed: December 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER Closing the Case signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/31/2018. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER AFTER 145 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/28/2018. Stipulated Dismissal due by 10/31/2018. All other pending dates, conferences and hearings are VACATED. (Hall, S)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK to Update the Docket and TERMINATE the United States of America as a Defendant 143 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/13/2018. (Hall, S)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER DIRECTING THE PARTIES to File an Amended Stipulation Pursuant to Rule 41, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/28/2018. (Hall, S)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/19/2018. (Kusamura, W)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER AFTER 134 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT with the United States of America, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/14/2018. Stipulation to dismiss or motion to dismiss due by 8/17/2018. (Hall, S)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER DENYING 125 Stipulation to Amend the Case Schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/6/2018. (Hall, S)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 STIPULATION and ORDER 120 to Set Settlement Conference and Modifying the Scheduling Order to Extend Time for Expert Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/15/2018. Expert discovery deadline 4/27/2018. Settlement Conference set for 3/5/2018 at 01:30 PM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 Order APPROVING the stipulation of the parties and modifying the scheduling order to extend time for discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/27/2017. (Rosales, O)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/10/2017. Pleading Amendment Deadline 4/7/2017. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 1/23/2017; Non-Expert 12/1/2017; Expert 3/16/2018. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: File d by 3/30/2018; Hearing by 4/27/2018. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 5/11/2018; Hearing by 7/9/2018. Settlement Conference set for 8/17/2018 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Pretrial Conference set for 9/4/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Jury Trial set for 11/6/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Hall, S)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER GRANTING 111 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to the Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/22/2016. (Hall, S)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER to Plaintiff to File His First Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/8/2016. First Amended Complaint due by 12/12/2016. (Hall, S)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATION and ORDER 87 to Continue Status Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/27/2016. Status Conference CONTINUED to 9/9/2016 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Joint status report due by 9/2/2016. (Hall, S)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 68 Motion for Entry of Final Judgment, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/6/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER vacating hearing of October 28, 2013 and taking matter under submission signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/25/13. (Nazaroff, H)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Granting Defendant United States' 43 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 09/06/2013. (Flores, E)
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Defendant The Geo Group, Inc., from this Action without Prejudice signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 07/16/2013. (Flores, E)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER vacating hearing date of June 24, 2013 and taking the matter under submission. THE COURT FURTHER ORDERS THAT HARD COPIES OF THE DECLARATIONS ANDAND EXHIBITS FILED IN SUPPORT AND OPPOSITION OF THE MOTION BE SUBMITTED FORTHWITH. signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/20/13. (Nazaroff, H)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER re: Joint Notice of Request to Seal Documents Regarding Opposition to United States' Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/11/2013. (Marrujo, C)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION and ORDER to continue the 43 MOTION to DISMISS Hearing currently set for 6/17/2013 to 6/24/2013 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/5/2013. (Kusamura, W)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/9/2013 RE: 47 UNOPPOSED NOTICE OF REQUEST TO SEAL DOCUMENTS filed by United States of America. (Lundstrom, T)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Stipulation for Extension of Hearing Date and Scheduling Conference; ORDER, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/16/2013. (Motion Hearing set for 6/17/2013 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Scheduling Conference set for 7/30/2013 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston.) (Marrujo, C)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 SECOND STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint re 41 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/8/2013. (Hall, S)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING IN PART Stipulation for Defendants' to Have Leave to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint re 37 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/25/2013. (Hall, S)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION (Doc. 29 ) and DENYING Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 13 , 19 ), Signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/21/2013. (Arellano, S.)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order re STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint 32 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/20/2013. Initial Scheduling Conference CONTINUED to 6/27/2013 at 09:00 AM at the United States Courthouse, 510 19th Street, Bakersfield, before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Denying Motions to Dismiss of Defendants GEO and MTC 13 19 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/4/2013. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 2/19/2013. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edison v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The GEO Group Inc.
Represented By: Susan Eileen Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Management and Training Corporation
Represented By: Susan Eileen Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Edison
Represented By: Jason Kenneth Feldman
Represented By: Ian Michael Wallach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?