Mello v. Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Phil Mello
Defendant: Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc., Chicago Electric Power Tools, Black & Decker (U.S.), Inc. and DeWalt Industrial Tool Co.
Case Number: 1:2012cv02054
Filed: December 18, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 08/03/2015. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER requiring parties to file dispositional documents by August 3, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/6/2015. (Hernandez, M)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER to Continue the Trial Date, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/9/2015. (Jury Trial previously set for 7/21/2015, has been CONTINUED to 7/28/2015, at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii.) (Gaumnitz, R)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Status Conference Pending Completion of Mediation, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/23/2014. (Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/26/2015, at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii.) (Gaumnitz, R)
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RESCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/23/2013. The Court HEREBY ORDERS that the settlement conference currently scheduled for Monday, August 26, 2013 is VACATED and rescheduled for Thursday, September 26, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 9 before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Arellano, S.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mello v. Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phil Mello
Represented By: Greg A. Muir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.
Represented By: David J. Frankenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Electric Power Tools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black & Decker (U.S.), Inc.
Represented By: Phillip Alden Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeWalt Industrial Tool Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?