Sheehan v. CDCR - Jamestown et al
Plaintiff: Randall Lee Sheehan
Defendant: CDCR - Jamestown and E Cervantes
Case Number: 1:2012cv02060
Filed: December 19, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tuolumne
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of 1 Action for Failure to State a Claim; Twenty-One Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/4/2013. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 12/30/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DENYING Motion for Extension of Time and Stay of Action for Sixty Days as Moot, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/11/2013. (Martin-Gill, S)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ADOPTING 18 Findings and Recommendations Regarding Denial of Plaintiff's 14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/1/2013. (Marrujo, C)
May 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief, filed November 1, 2012, be DENIED with Prejudice for Lack of Jurisdiciton re 1 Complaint filed by Randall Lee Sheeha; referred to Judge O'Neill, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 05/21/2013. Objections to F&R due by 6/24/2013(Martin-Gill, S)
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING 16 Motion for Default Judgment, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 05/02/2013. (Figueroa, O)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel 12 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/21/13: Motion is DENIED without prejudice. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheehan v. CDCR - Jamestown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Lee Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDCR - Jamestown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Cervantes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?