Reddy v. Precyse Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Krishna Reddy
Defendant: Precyse Solutions, LLC, Jeffrey Levitt, Chris Powell, Cheryl Servais, Sally Kurth, Stacie Moore, Sharon Fremer, Janell Bailey-Beach, Sherry Todd and Shirley Wilder
Case Number: 1:2012cv02061
Filed: December 19, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: San Bernardino
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER REVOKING In Forma Pauperis Status signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/27/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Terminating Sanctions for Plaintiff's Failure to Comply with Court Orders signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/18/2015. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 7/13/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER Denying 118 Reconsideration, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/16/2015. (IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs 118 motion for reconsideration is DENIED.) (Gaumnitz, R)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting in part 115 Motion to Shorten Time for hearing on motion to compel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/12/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER re E-mails to Court signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/2/2015. (Jessen, A)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 101 Motion for Reconsideration; ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 103 Motion to Disqualify Magistrate Judge, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/22/2015. (Gaumnitz, R)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER GRANTING 94 Application for Order Shortening Time signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/14/2015. Opposition to Motion to Compel due by 5/21/2015. Reply, if any, due by 5/22/2015. Motion to Compel Hearing set for 5/26/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Jessen, A)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER AND MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE; GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO AMEND THE SCHEDULING ORDER; DENYING PARTIES" REQUESTS FOR SANCTIONS; AND VACATING THE MAY 6, 2015 HEARING re 63 , 65 , 72 , 78 , 80 , 81 , 83 , 84 , 85 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/4/2015. (Non-Expert Discovery ddl 5/21/2015. Non-Dispositive Motions ddl 6/5/2015). (Lundstrom, T)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Ex Parte Application Shortening Time to Hear Defendant's Amended Motion to Amend Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/15/2015. (Kusamura, W)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER re: Ex Parte Application to Amend the Scheduling Order; Opposition to Defendant's Motion is due 4/22/2015, Reply is due by 4/29/2015, Motion to Amend the Scheduling Hearing set for 5/6/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/13/2015. (Kusamura, W)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER re SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/14/2014. (Timken, A)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Certification of Non-Final Orders for Appeal and Request for Stay of Proceedings 31 ; Dismissing Certain Claims and Defendants, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/3/14. Jeffrey Levitt, Chris Powell, Cheryl Servais, Sally Kurth, Stacie Moore, Sharon Fremer, Janell Bailey-Beach, Sherry Todd, and Shirley Wilder DISMISSED.(Verduzco, M)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/23/2014. (Amended Complaint due by 2/18/2014).(Lundstrom, T)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 21 Motion to Vacate the order dismissing action signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/13/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION for Failure to Prosecute signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/5/2013. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER on Motions and on Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendations 12 , 14 & 15 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/29/2013. (Kusamura, W)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER VACATING Hearing Date and Taking Matter Under Submission, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/28/2013. (The hearing date of 9/3/2013 is hereby VACATED, and the parties shall not appear at that time. The Court will take Plaintiff's 14 Motion to Vacate and Set Aside Order under submission and thereafter issue its decision.)(Gaumnitz, R)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 06/18/2013 recommending that action be dismissed, without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to prosecute re 1 Complaint. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 7/5/2013. (Lundstrom, T)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying 10 MOTION for RECONSIDERATION re 9 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/11/2013. (Lundstrom, T)
May 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING 6 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel; ORDER DENYING 8 Plaintiff's Motion for Permission to File Pleadings and Other Papers Electronically; and ORDER GRANTING 7 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 5/9/2013. Amended Complaint or Notice due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF to Either File Amended Complaint or Notify Court of Willingness to Proceed Only on Cognizable Claims, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 4/12/2013. First Amended Complaint or Notice due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/20/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reddy v. Precyse Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krishna Reddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precyse Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Levitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Servais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally Kurth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacie Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Fremer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janell Bailey-Beach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Wilder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?