Bryant v. Romero et al
Plaintiff: Kevin D. Bryant
Defendant: R. Romero, P. Gallagher, Stiles, A. Sells, C. Waddle, D. Sellers, E. Castellanos, M. D. Biter, Matthew Cate and B. Daveiga
Case Number: 1:2012cv02074
Filed: December 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER of Dismissal; ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Close Case signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 09/29/2017. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER Regarding Notice of Settlement 209 ; ORDER VACATING Current Deadlines 208 ; ORDER REMOVING Motions for Summary Judgment From Court's Calendar 92 , 96 ; ORDER GRANTING Request to File Dispositional Documents Within Sixty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/19/17. (Hellings, J)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 208 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending That Defendant Waddle's Motion for Summary Judgment Be Denied 96 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/17/17: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER Granting 204 Joint Stipulation for a Seven-Day Extension of Time to Reply to Defendant Waddle's Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/21/17. Deadline: 6/30/2017. (Gonzalez, R)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 193 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/8/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER Denying CDCR's Motion to Quash and Granting CDCR's Requests for an In Camera Review and Protective Order re 137 ; ORDER for CDCR to Provide Court with Redacted Documents and a Proposed Protective Order Within Twenty Days; ORDER re Co urt's Intent to Release Documents with Protective Order After Redaction; ORDER Extending Time Until May 3, 2017 for Plaintiff to Oppose Motions for Summary Judgment; ORDER Granting Plaintiff Ten Days to File Rule 56(d) Motion, with Additional Te n Days for Defendants to Respond; ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Pending Discovery Motions, without Prejudice to Renewal After Resolution of Motions for Summary Judgment re 134 , 135 , 140 , 157 , 162 , 174 , 175 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/6/17. (Gonzalez, R)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER DENYING 176 & 179 Plaintiff's Requests for a Telephonic Status Conference and for the Court to Reset Case Deadlines and Allow Additional Discovery, Without Prejudice and ORDER for Plaintiff to File Opposition to Both of Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment Within 45 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/18/2017. (Jessen, A)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 172 Motion for Extension of Time to File Replies to Defendants' Oppositions to Motion to Extend Discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/08/2016. (Flores, E)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER denying 156 Motion to Compel KC's Court Reporting Service to report depositions and for sanctions signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/25/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 124 Motion for Hearing to Request Injunctive Relief, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/21/16. (Verduzco, M)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to Motions for Summary Judgment by Defendants Castellanos and Waddle, within Sixty (60) Days as to 92 and 96 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/27/2016. (60-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION COMPELLING DISCLOSURE OF DISCOVERY 109 AND ORDER DIRECTING PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUBPOENAS DUCES TECUM WITHIN SEVEN DAYS BY UNITED STATES MARSHAL WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF COSTS RE 95 signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/29/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Plaintiff's 78 Motion to Compel; ORDER COMPELLING Defendant Waddle to Provide further Responses within Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/22/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER DIRECTING Personal Service of Subpoenas Duces Tecum Within Seven Days by United State Marshal Without Prepayment of Costs, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/24/16. (Marrujo, C)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Objections and Granting Motion for Reconsideration in Part; ORDER Granting Plaintiff Leave to File Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline; ORDER and NOTICE Authorizing Issuance of Subpoena Duces Tecum Directing Productio n of Documents by Christian Pfeiffer, Warden of KVSP; ORDER and NOTICE Authorizing Issuance of Subpoena Duces Tecum Directing Production of Documents by Christian Pfeiffer, Warden of KVSP, for In Camera Review; ORDER Directing Clerk's Office to Serve Copies of Subpoenas With Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 6/1/2016. (Marrujo, C)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER TERMINATING 104 Motion to Compel ; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Re-File Plaintiff's Motion for Order Compelling Disclosure in case no. 1:11-cv-00446 BAM PC, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 05/24/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER GRANTING 98 Ex Parte Application of Defendant Waddle for Leave to Supplement the Motion for Summary Judgment With Declaration of Former Appeals Coordinator B. Daveiga, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/5/16. (Marrujo, C)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS FOR SUBPOENAS DUCES TECUM 53 , 82 ; NOTICE AUTHORIZING ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM DIRECTING PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS BY CHRISTIAN PFEIFFER, WARDEN OF KVSP; DIRECTING CLERK'S OFFICE TO SERVE COPY OF SUBPOENA WITH ORDER; DISREGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR COURT RULING 75 ; DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION AND SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO COMPEL INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND DISCOVERY RESPONSES 68 , 76 AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO MODIFY THE SCHEDULING ORDER 74 signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/29/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 56 , 63 , signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/9/16: Plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief and/or motion for an alternative way of communicating with other inmates is DENIED. (Hellings, J)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT WADDLE'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO MODIFY THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO BRING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE EXHAUSTION 71 signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/11/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion For Leave To Serve Additional Interrogatories On Defendant Waddle (ECF No. 57 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/9/2015. (Fahrney, E)
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Adopting Findings And Recommedendation And Denying Plaintiff's Motion To Strike (ECF Nos. 47 , 41 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/23/2015. (Fahrney, E)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE 41 AND DENYING MOTION FOR EXPEDITED RULING 45 signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/5/2015. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 10/22/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Adopting Findings And Recommendation And Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Injunction (ECF Nos. 30 , 34 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/12/2015. (Fahrney, E)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Defendant Waddle's And Castellanos' Motion To Revoke In Forma Pauperis Status Be Denied (ECF No. 29 ), Objection Deadline: Thirty Days (ECF No. 29 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/9/2015. F&R's referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 7/13/2015.(Fahrney, E)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's 30 Motion for Injunctive Relief (Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days); ORDER GRANTING 31 Motion for Extension of Time (Opposition to Motion to Revoke In Forma Pauperis Status Due Within Thirty Days), signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/29/2015, referred to Judge O'Neill. (Marrujo, C)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Court Order Directing Defendants To Preserve Records (ECF No. 17 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/21/2015. (Fahrney, E)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Denying Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (ECF No. 8 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/20/2013. (Fahrney, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant v. Romero et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin D. Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Sells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Waddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Castellanos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. D. Biter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Daveiga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?