Herrera v. Rouch
Plaintiff: Roberto Herrera
Defendant: Rouch
Case Number: 1:2013cv00289
Filed: February 27, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER DENYING Motion for Reconsideration 118 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/10/15: The action shall remain closed. (Hellings, J)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER DENYING 114 Motion for Reconsideration ; ORDER DENYING 115 Motion to Amend/Supplement Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 04/26/2015. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER ADOPTING 88 Findings and Recommendation to DENY Defendant's 32 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/6/2015. (Marrujo, C)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER (1) DENYING 105 Motion for Reconsideration, and GRANTING 107 Motion for Extension of Time, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/24/2015. (Marrujo, C)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER Regarding 105 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 02/03/15. Fourteen-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 104 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the action be Dismissed, with prejudice, for failure to obey a court order and failure to prosecute re 88 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 32 be DENIED re 32 MOTION to DISMISS filed by Rouch;referred to Judge O'Neill, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 01/14/2015. Objections to F&R due by 2/2/2015 (Martin-Gill, S)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER (1) DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Expert 84 (2) DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel 84 and (3) REQUIRING Plaintiff to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 81 ; NOTICE and Warning of Requirements for Opposing Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/11/14: Twenty-One (21) Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration 43 : Motion is DENIED with prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/28/14. (Hellings, J)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER GRANTING 44 Motion for Copies, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/18/14. (SENDING PLAINTIFF: 17 , 21 , 25 , 29 and 35 ) (Martin-Gill, S)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 32 be DENIED re 32 MOTION to DISMISS filed by Rouch ; referred to Judge O'Neill,signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/15/14. Objections to F&R due by 10/3/2014 (Martin-Gill, S)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's 65 Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER DENYING Defendant's Request to Convert the Unenumberated 12(B) Portion of the Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 8/1/14. (30-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER DENYING 42 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/10/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Adopting 29 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DENYING Plaintiff's 21 25 Motions for Preliminary Injunctive Relief signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/13/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DENYING with prejudice 28 Motion for Medical Examination, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/28/2013. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DENYING 25 Motion for Appointment of Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/20/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Plaintiff's 21 25 Motions for a Preliminary Injunction be Denied; Objections Due within Fourteen Days signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/13/2013. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 1/2/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Denying 23 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/13/2013. (Flores, E)
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DENYING 21 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/10/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herrera v. Rouch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rouch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?