Kietty v. Walker et al
Plaintiff: Hussein Ali Kietty
Defendant: A. Walker, L. Ybarra, A. Astorga, S. Deathriage, Brumbagh, J. Duty, M. Hernandez, L. Rumbles and R. Silva
Case Number: 1:2013cv00312
Filed: March 5, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Close Case re 126 Stipulation signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/20/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 120 Fifth Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/28/17. (Marrujo, C)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER DENYING 106 Plaintiff's Motion for Injunctive Relief signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/5/2017. (Jessen, A)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTENDANCE OF UNINCARCERATED WITNESSES WILLING TO TESTIFY VOLUNTARILY AS UNNECESSARY AND EXTENDING DEADLINES FOR PROCEDURES TO OBTAIN ATTENDANCE OF UNINCARCERATED WITNESSES WHO REFUSE TO TESTIFY VOLUNTARILY 111 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/26/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER regarding 103 Motion for attendance of incarcerated witnesses at trial signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/6/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER SETTING Deadline for Filing any Motions for Incarcerated Witnesses signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/15/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/8/2017 denying, without prejudice 91 Motion for the attendance of incarcerated witnesses. (Lundstrom, T)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER SETTING Telephonic Hearing to Dismiss Defendants' Motion for Continue the Trial Date signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/12/2017. Scheduling Conference set for 1/20/2017 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Sant Agata, S)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER DENYING 92 Plaintiff's Motion for Waiver of Witnesses Fees signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/9/2017. (Jessen, A)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 84 Plaintiff's Motion for Filing Investigative Claim Under Witness Testimony and Vacating Trial Preparation signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/30/2016. (Jessen, A)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER VACATING Telephonic Trial Conference Hearing on October 31, 2016, at 10:30 a.m., (Doc 76 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/27/2016. (Marrujo, C)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER SETTING Telephonic Trial Conference Hearing on 10/31/2016 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/21/16. (Marrujo, C)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER DENYING Without Prejudice 68 Plaintiff's Third Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/7/2016. (Jessen, A)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER DENYING 69 Plaintiff's Motion for Copy and/or Return of Exhibits Previously Filed With the Court signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/6/2016. (Jessen, A)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER DISCHARGING the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum and Directing that Plaintiff be Transported Back to the California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/23/2016. (Jessen, A)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER DENYING 58 Defendants' Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and ORDER DENYING 59 Motion for Summary Judgment as Untimely signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/24/2016. (Jessen, A)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/31/2016. Settlement Conference set for 6/22/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Jessen, A)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING 50 Plaintiff's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Defendant L. Rumbles From the Action signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/21/2016. (Jessen, A)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/25/2016 directing Defendant, Rumbles to file an opposition or statement of non-opposition to 50 MOTION to dismiss. (Filing Deadline: 3/17/2016). (Lundstrom, T)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DENYING 36 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/2/2015. (Jessen, A)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DIRECTING Defendants to Consent to or Decline United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Within Fifteen Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/24/2015. (Marrujo, C)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion Direct Defendants to File a Response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint 29 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/19/14. (Hellings, J)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Directing Defendants to File a Response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/6/14. 30-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying 24 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/23/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DIRECTING Defendants to File a Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint 17 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/18/14: 10-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING 2 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 3/6/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kietty v. Walker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hussein Ali Kietty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Ybarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Astorga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Deathriage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brumbagh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Duty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Rumbles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?