Chavez v. Kings County et al
Plaintiff: Juan Chavez
Defendant: Kings County, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Gibson, J. Keener, J. Gonzales, E. Castro, H. Florez, B. Simmons, S. Longoria and L. A. Martinez
Case Number: 1:2013cv00342
Filed: March 13, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER closing case in light of Stipulation for Dismissal with prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/28/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Juan Chavez on March 9, 2017 signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/16/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/15/2017. Settlement Conference set for 3/9/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng.(Sant Agata, S)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER DENYING 68 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/12/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER on Defendant's 63 Notice Declining Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/9/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Juan Chavez, CDC# H-16333, Plaintiff, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/24/2016. (Marrujo, C)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER VACATING 56 WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM DIRECTING THE PRODUCTION OF PLAINTIFF FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON SEPTEMBER 8, 2016 AT 10:00 A.M. signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/17/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Plaintiff, Juan Chavez for a Settlement Conference on 9/8/2016 @ 10:00 a.m. signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/15/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER SETTING Settlement Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/3/2016. Settlement Conference set for 9/8/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. (Sant Agata, S)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DENYING 50 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/26/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 46 Motions for Copies of Motions for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/12/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's and Defendant's Motions for Summary Judgment (Docs. 28 , 36 ) signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/18/2016. The parties are directed to advise the Court within thirty (30) days whether a settlement conference would be beneficial. (Jessen, A)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Requiring Defendant to Submit Entire Deposition Transcript in Compliance With Local Rule 133(J) On Or Before January 12, 2016, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/5/16. (Hellings, J)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ASSIGNING Action to United States Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/24/2015. (Marrujo, C)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING 20 Discovery Motion signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/7/2015. (Jessen, A)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Directing that Action Proceed Against Defendant Castro for Excessive Force, Assault and Battery and Dismissing Other Claims and Parties, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/21/2013. Gibson (Warden), J. Gonzales (Lieutenant), J. Keener (Lieutenant), Kings County, S. Longoria (Correctional Officer), L. A. Martinez (Sergeant), B. Simmons (Correctional Officer), California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation and H. Florez (Correctional Officer) terminated. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chavez v. Kings County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kings County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Florez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Longoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. A. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?