Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance v. Strongtower Financial Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Defendant: Strongtower Financial Inc., Deanna L. Buchholz, Eric Hirschfield, James Winter, Katherine S. Westlake, Raymond K. Jones, Ana Gonzalez, Victor Michels, Randi Armstrong, Katherine A. Garrett and Jeffrey S. Raynes
Case Number: 1:2013cv00383
Filed: March 14, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to Close Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/30/2015. CASE CLOSED.(Marrujo, C)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting 128 Stipulation of Dismissal of Action as to Defendants, Jeffrey S. Raynes and Randi Armstrong signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/14/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 127 Order VACATING January 21, 2015 hearing, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/13/2015. (Dispositional Documents filed by 1/21/2015) (Figueroa, O)
December 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Order setting briefing schedule for Motion to Enforce Settlement, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/24/2014. (Motion to Enforce the Settlement filed by 1/6/2015; Opposition filed by 1/13/2015; Motion to Enforce the Judgment Hearing set for 1/21/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone) (Figueroa, O)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 123 STIPULATION and ORDER DISMISSING Defendant Ana Gonzalez signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/24/2014. Ana Gonzalez (an individual and trustee of Gonzalez Trust UAD 5-29-07 and the Estate of Cesar T. Gonzalez) terminated. (Sant Agata, S)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER setting Telephonic Conference re: Settlement for 12/23/2014 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/20/2014. (Kusamura, W)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Dismissing Defendant Kathleen A. Garrett From This Action, ORDER Directing The Clerk To Terminate Kathleen A. Garrett On The Docket, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/14/2014. Kathleen A. Garrett (and individual) terminated. (Fahrney, E)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER DISMISSING Defendant Deanna L. Buchholz; ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to Terminate Deanna L. Buchholz on the Docket, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/12/2014. (Marrujo, C)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 108 JUDGMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/5/2014. (Marrujo, C)
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting continuance of date for dispositive documents to 11/3/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/2/2014. (Hernandez, M)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 103 STIPULATION For Dismissal Of Action As To Defendant Katherine S. Westlake; ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/19/2014. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Katherine Westlake only be DISMISSED from this action with prejudice. Each party is to bear its own attorneys fees and costs. Katherine S. Westlake terminated. (Fahrney, E)
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER requiring parties to file dispositional documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/25/2014. (Hernandez, M)
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER GRANTING Continuance of Date for Dispositive Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/23/2014. Dispositive documents to be filed by 8/25/2014. (Marrujo, C)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Following Settlement; Vacating Dates And Directing Parties To File Dispositive Documents Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/23/2014. (Dispositive Motions filed by 7/28/2014)(Fahrney, E)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER DISMISSING Defendant Raymond K. Jones only, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/3/2014. (Jessen, A)
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION For Dismissal Of Action As To Defendants James Winter And Eric Hirschfield; ORDER, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/24/2013. Eric Hirschfield (an individual) and James Winter (an individual) terminated. (Fahrney, E)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION And ORDER To Set Aside The Clerk's Default Of Deanna L. Buchholz (Doc. 40 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/6/2013. (Fahrney, E)
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Time to File Answer and Continuing the Scheduling Conference. (1) Defendants Eric Hirschfield and James Winter to file responsive pleading by 9/23/2013; (2) Initial SCHEDULING CONFERENCE is continued from 9/18/2013 to October 22, 2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. A JOINT Scheduling Conference Report, carefully prepared and executed by all counsel, shall be electronically filed in full compliance with the requirements set forth in the Order Setting Mandatory Scheduling Conference, one (1) full week prior to the Scheduling Conference, and a copy shall be e-mailed, in WordPerfect or Word format, to bamorders@caed.uscourts.gov. The parties may appear by telephone. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/23/2013. (Herman, H)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION to Extend Time to File Answer; ORDER thereon - defendants Eric Hirschfield and James Winter answer or responsive motion to the complaint by 7/23/2013. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/14/2013. (Herman, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance v. Strongtower Financial Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard S. Endres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strongtower Financial Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deanna L. Buchholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Hirschfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine S. Westlake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond K. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Michels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randi Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine A. Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey S. Raynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?