Barbosa v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Joanna Barbosa
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2013cv00410
Filed: March 19, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and ORDER for the Award of Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. 2412(d) signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/17/2014. (Martinez, A)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Social Security Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 09/30/14. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER for a First Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Opening Brief signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/16/2013. (Martinez, A)
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Plaintiff's Time to File an Opening Brief to November 12, 2013, Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/30/2013. (Arellano, S.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barbosa v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Susan L. Smith, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanna Barbosa
Represented By: Ann M. Cerney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?