Emmons et al v. Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc. et al

Defendant: Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc., Quest Diagnostics Incorporated and Quest Diagnostics Nichols Institute
Plaintiff: Dorothea Emmons and Lisa Stapleton
Case Number: 1:2013cv00474
Filed: April 1, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Referring Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 22, 2016 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (Doc. 74 ), signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/21/2016. (Final Approval of Class Action Settlement set for 11/1/2016, at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Class Certification Hearing previously set for 11/15/2016, is VACATED.)(Gaumnitz, R)
December 4, 2015 72 Opinion or Order of the Court Stipulation and PROTECTIVE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/4/2015. Please NOTE the new case number for all future filings - 1:13-cv-00474-DAD-BAM. (Herman, H)
August 13, 2015 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO ADD QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED AS A NAMED DEFENDANT TO THE ACTION AND DIRECTING CLERK TO ADD DEFENDANT TO THE DOCKET signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/12/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
May 11, 2015 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Thereon Granting Stipulation (Doc. 58) Regarding Further Proceedings on Removal and Remand. In view of the parties stipulation, and good cause existing therefore, the Court hereby orders as follows: a) Defendants may file an amended notice of removal along with supplemental evidence supporting jurisdiction by June 30, 2015; b) If after evaluating Defendants amended notice Plaintiffs continue to challenge jurisdiction, they will file a motion for remand by July 21, 2015; c) Plaintiffs moti on for remand, if filed, will proceed as a regular motion pursuant to Local Rule 230(c) and the Courts scheduling calendar, with Defendants having the opportunity to submit an opposition to the motion and Plaintiffs having the opportunity to submit a reply in connection with the motion in accordance with the applicable rules and standards. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/11/2015. (Herman, H)
October 2, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Motion For Stay Pending Appeal (Doc. 46 ), signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/1/2014. Case Management Deadline: 4/3/2015 (Fahrney, E)
February 20, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER HOLDING The Parties' Joint Stipulation to Add Quest Diagnostics Incorporated as a Named Defendant to the Action in Abeyance Pending a Final Ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (Doc. 34). signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/20/2014. (Herman, H)
February 12, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court Findings and Recommendations GRANTING Plaintiffs' 7 Motion for Remand, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/11/2014. Motion referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 3/4/2014. (Figueroa, O)
November 5, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS (Doc. 14) AND ORDERING Supplemental Briefing (Doc. 22): (1) The Findings and Recommendations filed 6/27/2013 (Doc. 14) are vacated; (2) Plaintiff's Motion for Administrative Relief for Leave for Suppl emental Briefing is GRANTED (Doc. 22); (3) On or before November 20, 2013, the parties may file optional supplemental briefing addressing whether Defendants have satisfied the preponderance of evidence standard of proof. Any supplemental briefing should not exceed 5 pages. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/5/2013. (Herman, H)
October 4, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Referring Pending Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing 22 to Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe; ORDER Vacating October 7, 2013 Hearing Date, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/3/13. (Verduzco, M)
June 27, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand 7 . Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due within 15 days of service of this recommendation. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/27/2013. (Herman, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emmons et al v. Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan M Brenner
Represented By: Erica C. Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Diagnostics Incorporated
Represented By: Jonathan M Brenner
Represented By: Erica C. Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Diagnostics Nichols Institute
Represented By: Jonathan M Brenner
Represented By: Erica C. Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothea Emmons
Represented By: Nathan Thomas Lowery
Represented By: Raul Perez
Represented By: Alexandria Marie Witte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Stapleton
Represented By: Nathan Thomas Lowery
Represented By: Raul Perez
Represented By: Alexandria Marie Witte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?