Castillo v. United States Internal Revenue Service

Plaintiff: Heather Castillo
Defendant: United States Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 1:2013cv00517
Filed: April 9, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Referring Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 29:791 Job Discrimination (Rehabilitation Act)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 26, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 43 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/26/16: Defendant's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED; The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to enter judgment for Defendant; and This case shall be CLOSED. (CASE CLOSED) (Hellings, J)
November 2, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court Stipulation and Order to Vacate Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/02/2015. (Yu, L)
April 21, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER to CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. The Scheduling Conference currently set for 4/24/2014, is CONTINUED to 5/15/2014, at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties' joint scheduling report shall be filed by no later than 5/8/2014. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/21/2014. (Timken, A)
March 26, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 12 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/25/14. (Hellings, J)
January 16, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER to CONTINUE Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/16/2014. (The Scheduling Conference currently set for 1/23/2014, is CONTINUED to 3/27/2014, at 09:15 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto.)(Gaumnitz, R)
October 31, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER to CONTINUE Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference currently set for 11/5/2013, is CONTINUED to 1/23/2014, at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/30/2013. (Timken, A)
September 18, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER to CONTINUE Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference currently set for 9/20/2013, is CONTINUED to 11/5/2013, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties' joint scheduling report shall be filed by no later than 10/29/2013. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/18/2013. (Timken, A)
August 27, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING Hearing Date of September 3, 2013 and Taking Matter Under Submission, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/27/2013. (IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the previously set hearing date of 9/3/2013, is VACATED, and no party shall appear at that time. As of that date, the court will take the 12 Motion to Dismiss, 14 Opposition to Motion, and 15 Reply to Response to Motion, under submission and will thereafter issue a decision.)(Gaumnitz, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castillo v. United States Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Castillo
Represented By: Stephen Labiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?