Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Old Republic Insurance Company, et al
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Defendant: Old Republic Insurance Company, Everest Indemnity Insurance Company, Interstate Fire & Casualty Company, Financial Pacific Insurance Company, Arch Specialty Insurance Company, Navigators Specialty Insurance Company, Clarendon National Insurance Company, Ace American Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Aspen Specialty Insurance Company, First Specialty Insurance Corporation, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, American Safety Indemnity Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company, RRG, Security America Risk Retention Group, Illinois Union Insurance Company, Zurich North American Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Northern Insurance Company of New York, Chartis Specialty Insurance Company, Navigators Insurance Company, Truck Insurance Exchange, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London and Praetorian Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2013cv00576
Filed: April 19, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER re Stipulation to Dismiss 265 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/2/15. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER re Stipulation and Second Joint Request for Extension of Time to File Final Dismissal Papers. PURSUANT TO A STIPULATION AND SECOND JOINT REQUEST BY THE PARTIES (Doc. 263), the Court hereby extends the time for the parties to file all final di smissal papers from September 3, 2015, as required by the order on the Parties Stipulation and Order to Extend the Time to File Final Dismissal Papers entered July 20, 2015 [Dkt. No. 257] for a period of 60 days to November 2, 2015. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/31/2015. (Herman, H)
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER on Stipulation to Dismiss Defendant Northern Insurance Company of New York With Prejudice, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/7/2015. (Marrujo, C)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER on Stipulation to Dismiss Defendant Arch Specialty Insurance Company With Prejudice, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/17/2015. (Marrujo, C)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 257 STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend the Time to File Final Dismissal Papers: the Court hereby extends the time for the parties to file all final dismissal papers from July 20, 2015 as required by the Courts Minute Order of May 20, 2015 (Doc. 251) for a period of 45 days to September 3, 2015. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/15/2015. (Herman, H)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER on STIPULATION to DISMISS Defendants AIG Specialty Insurance Company FKA Chartis Specialty Insurance Company, FKA American International Specialty Lines Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, and National Union of Fire Insurance Compa ny of Pittsburgh, PA with Prejudice, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/1/15. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA (a Pennsylvania corporation ), Chartis Specialty Insurance Company (an Illinois corporation) and Lexington Insurance Company (a Delaware corporation ) terminated. (Gonzalez, R)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER on Stipulation (Doc. 243) and Joint Request to Continue Date for Mandatory Settlement Conference. Mandatory Settlement Conference currently set for April 1, 2015 is hereby continued to April 22, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge McAuliffe. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/31/2015. (Herman, H)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER on Defendant Northern Insurance Company of New York's Request to be Excused from the Mandatory Settlement Conference: Pursuant to NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW YORKS (NORTHERN) Notice of Settlement and Request to be Excused from the Mandatory Settlement Conference (Doc. 238), and good caused existing therefore: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that NORTHERN and its counsel are excused from appearing at the April 1, 2015 Settlement Conference. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/27/2015. (Herman, H)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER Excusing AIG Specialty Insurance Complany (fka Chartis Specialty Insurance Company fka American International Specialty Lines Insurance Company), Lexington Insurance Company and National Union Fire Insurance Company's Appearance at the Mandatory Settlement Conference: based upon the representation filed (Doc. 225), are excused from appearing at the Mandatory Settlement Conference on April 1, 2015. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/26/2015. (Herman, H)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER on Defendant Everest National Insurance Company's Request to Appear by Telephone at the Settlement Conference (Doc. 220). Pursuant to EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S request to appear by telephone at the April 1, 2015 Settlemen t Conference and good caused existing therefore: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S claim representative be allowed to attend the April 1, 2015 Settlement Conference telephonically in lieu of personal attendance. IT I S FURTHER ORDERED that the claim representative shall be continuously on the telephone line via speakerphone anytime that the Court is in joint session or speaking with counsel for Everest. Sanctions may be imposed for failure to fully participate in the settlement conference. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/24/2015. (Herman, H)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER Regarding Settlement Conference (set for April 1, 2015 at 9:30 a.m. before Judge McAuliffe), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/19/2015. (Herman, H)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 216 STIPULATION and ORDER to Dismiss Defendant Everest Indemnity Insurance Company in the First Amended Complaint Only signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 03/12/2015. (Flores, E)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 212 STIPULATION and ORDER to Dismiss Defendant Interstate Fire & Casualty Company in the First Amended Complaint signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 03/12/2015. (Flores, E)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER Re Stipulation To Dismiss (Doc. 208 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/11/2015. The Court DISMISSES the FAC with prejudice against Defendants Clarendon American Insurance Company, erroneously named as Clarendon National Insurance Company, and Praetorian Insurance Company only. Clarendon National Insurance Company (a New Jersey corporation ) and Praetorian Insurance Company (a Pennsylvania) terminated. (Fahrney, E)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER Re Stipulation To Dismiss (Doc. 207 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/9/2015. Old Republic Insurance Company (a Pennsylvania corporation ) terminated.(Fahrney, E)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER on Stipulation (Doc. 205) and Joint Request for Extension of Time to Complete Non-Expert Discovery and Set Deadline for Parties to Complete a Settlement Conference: the deadlines for the parties to complete non-expert discovery previously se t for January 23, 2015, shall be continued to February 23, 2015. The parties are directed to complete alternative dispute resolution proceedings no later than March 30, 2015. The parties are cautioned that engaging in settlement discussions is not go od cause to continue any other dates. If the parties wish for the Court to set a settlement conference, the parties may contact Courtroom Deputy Harriet Herman at 559-499-5788. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/23/2015. (Herman, H)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER On STIPULATION To Dismiss Amco Insurance Company Pursuant To Federal Rules Of Civil Procedure, Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/14/2015. AMCO Insurance Company terminated. (Fahrney, E)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER on STIPULATION to DISMISS Defendant: Financial Pacific Insurance Company (a California corporation ) in the First Amended Complaint ONLY, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/29/14. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER on Stipulation to Dismiss Defendant Northern Insurance Company of New York as to Paragraph 81 of the First Amended Complaint Only, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/25/2014. (Marrujo, C)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER on Stipulation to Dismiss Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, 100% Syndicate 2020 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 06/02/2014. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, 100% Syndicate 2020 terminated from action.(Flores, E)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER on Stipulation re Partial Dismissal of Certain Allegations as Against Defendant Arch Specialty Insurance Company as to Arch Beutler Policies, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/28/2014. (Marrujo, C)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 165 STIPULATION and ORDER to DISMISS Defendant Everest Indemnity Insurance Company as to Paragraph 47 of the First Amended Complaint signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/2/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 161 STIPULATION and ORDER for Extention of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint: Defendant Underwriters further extention to respond to First Amended Complaint by 1/10/2014. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/20/2013. (Herman, H)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER on Stipulation to Dismiss Zurich American Insurance Company (erroneously sued as Zurich North American Insurance Company) Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/31/13. (Hellings, J)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER on Stipulation to Dismiss Defendant Catlin Specialty Insurance Company in Place of Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, 100% Syndicate 2020, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/23/13. (Hellings, J)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER on Stipulation to Partial Dismiss Defendant Arch Specialty Insurance Company as to Paragraphs 57 and 67 of the First Amended Complaint Only, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/1/2013. (Marrujo, C)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER to DISMISS Certain Defendant signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/13/2013. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (a Massachusetts corporation ) terminated. (Sant Agata, S)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER to Dismiss Individual Defendant signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 08/14/2013. Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company, RRG terminated from action. (Flores, E)
July 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER to DISMISS Single Defendant re 103 Notice, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/10/2013. Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company Dismissed. (Marrujo, C)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER to DISMISS Single Defendant re 102 Notice, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/10/2013. Defendant Aspen Specialty Insurance Company Dismissed.(Marrujo, C)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Re: 95 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 7/3/2013. (Defendant Aspen Specialty Insurance Company shall have up to an including 7/17/2013, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint.)(Gaumnitz, R)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER to Dismiss Single Defendant signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 06/21/2013. Truck Insurance Exchange Terminated from Action. (Flores, E)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Time to File a Responsive Pleading: by defendant Truck Insurance Exchange, by 7/1/2013. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/18/2013. (Herman, H)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER to Extend Time for Everest Indemnity Insurance Company to File a Responsive Pleading (re 66 Stipulation): Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by 7/3/2013. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/14/2013. (Herman, H)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Time to File a Responsive Pleading: Defendant Lexington Insurance Company response by 6/13/2013. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/10/2013. (Herman, H)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re: stipulation to extend time to respond to the Complaint 2 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 06/04/2013. (Response due by 6/28/2013) (Figueroa, O)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Old Republic Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Abel Eric Aguilera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everest Indemnity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interstate Fire & Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Pacific Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navigators Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarendon National Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspen Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Specialty Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Safety Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company, RRG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security America Risk Retention Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Union Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich North American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Insurance Company of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chartis Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navigators Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truck Insurance Exchange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Praetorian Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?