Dews v. Biter
Petitioner: Clarence Leon Dews
Respondent: Martin Biter
Case Number: 1:2013cv00626
Filed: April 30, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ADOPTING 25 Findings and Recommendations; ORDER DENYING Petitioner's 24 Motion for Reconsideration; ORDER DECLINING to Issue a Certificate of Appealability, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/27/2013. (Marrujo, C)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATIONS To Deny Petitioner's Motion For Reconsideration Of The Court's Denial Of A Certificate Of Appealability (Doc. 24 ), Objections Deadline: Thirty (30) Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/27/2013. F&R's referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 9/30/2013. (Fahrney, E)
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss the Petition 1 ; FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS to Decline to Issue a Certificate of Appealability and to Direct the Clerk to Close the Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/3/13: OBJECTIONS DEADLINE: THIRTY (30) DAYS. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dews v. Biter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Martin Biter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Clarence Leon Dews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?