Scott v. McAfee

Plaintiff: Michael Scott
Defendant: McAfee
Case Number: 1:2013cv00639
Filed: May 2, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Referring Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Case Should not be Dismissed for Failure to Comply With a Court Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 6/27/13. Response Due Within Fourteen Days. (Gonzalez, R)
July 24, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Case for Failure to Obey a Court Order 10 (OBJECTIONS DUE WITHIN FOURTEEN DAYS), signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/23/13. (Hellings, J)
May 1, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the U.S. District Court - Eastern District of California.. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/1/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2013) [Transferred from cand on 5/2/2013.]
May 7, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SUBMIT Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or PAY Filing Fee within 45 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 5/6/2013. (Attachments: # 1 IFP Application)(Sant Agata, S)
May 8, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING Unsigned Complaint and Requiring Plaintiff to File Signed Complaint Within Thirty Days 1 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 5/7/13. (Hellings, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. McAfee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McAfee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.