Mena v. Kern High School District et al

Plaintiff: Robert Mena
Defendant: Kern High School District, Melissa Boatman and John Ferguson
Case Number: 1:2013cv00650
Filed: May 2, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Referring Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 24, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING Hearing of February 26, 2016; ORDER DISMISSING Action, with Prejudice, as Barred by Claim Preclusion signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/24/2016. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
September 8, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/8/2015. (Timken, A)
January 30, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING STAY to March 31, 2014, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/30/2014. (Hall, S)
December 20, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING STAY to January 31, 2014, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/20/2013. (Hall, S)
November 12, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING STAY to December 20, 2013 re 13 signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/12/2013. Status Report Due No Later than 12/18/2013. (Hall, S)
September 30, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Motion to Stay 8 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/30/2013. CASE STAYED until November 1, 2013. Initial Scheduling Conference CONTINUED to 12/12/2013 at 09:30 AM at the United States Courthouse, 510 19th Street (JLT), Bakersfield, before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
August 28, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING on Motion to Stay 8 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/28/2013. The Initial Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED to 11/6/2013 at 09:30 AM at the United States Courthouse, 510 19th Street (JLT), Bakersfield, before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mena v. Kern High School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Mena
Represented By: Randall Martin Rumph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kern High School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Boatman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?