Moore v. Hinds Investments, L.P. a California Limited Partnership, et al.
Plaintiff: Ronald Moore
Defendant: Hinds Investments, L.P. and C & Z Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00665
Filed: May 7, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION and ORDER DISMISSING ACTION signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 07/09/2014. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER AFTER SETTLEMENT (Doc. 51 ), Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/11/2014. This Court VACATES all pending dates and matters, including dates related to the continued motion to compel and motion for sanctions and ORDERS the parties, no later than July 11, 2014, to file appropriate papers to dismiss or conclude this action in its entirety. (Arellano, S.)
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation to Waive Financial Factors of Defendant's Tenth and Seventeenth Affirmative Defenses, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/4/2014. (Kusamura, W)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION to Continue Settlement Conference; ORDER - Settlement Conference is continued from 1/28/2014 to March 17, 2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/23/2014. (Herman, H)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request that plaintiff may file his First Amended Complaint within five calendar days from the filing date of this Order. Defendant's response is due fourteen days after the filing of the First Amended Complaint. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/17/2013. (Rooney, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Hinds Investments, L.P. a California Limited Partnership, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hinds Investments, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C & Z Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Moore
Represented By: Tanya E. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?