Henley v. Lowe's HIW, Inc.
Plaintiff: Robert Henley
Defendant: Lowe's HIW, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00684
Filed: May 9, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER TO DISMISS AND CLOSE ACTION signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/21/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER VACATING Order RE Joint Status Report. It is hereby ordered that the Court's 2/21/2014 Order Re Joint Status report is VACATED. The Court's 2/21/2014 Order After Settlement shall remain in effect and the parties shall file appropriate papers to dismiss or conclude this action in its entirety no later than 4/4/40214. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/24/2014. (Hernandez, M)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER AFTER SETTLEMENT signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/21/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING 17 Lowe's Request to Seal Documents signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/6/2014. This Court FURTHER ORDERS defendant Lowe's, no later than February 7, 2014, to submit to the Court unredacted documents filed under seal. (Jessen, A)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/22/2013. (Kusamura, W)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER APPROVING the parties' stipulation for the filing of plaintiff's first amended complaint. Plaintiff's first amended complaint is due within seven (7) days of service of this order and defendant's response to same is due within thirty (30) days of service of this order. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/22/2013. (Rooney, M)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER (Fed.R.Civ.P 16), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/8/2013. (Initial Disclosures: 9/6/2013, Non-Expert Discovery: 4/2/2014, Expert Disclosure: 3/5/2014, Supplemental Expert Disclosure: 4/18/2014, Expert Discovery: 5/23/2014, Non-Dispositive Motion Filing ddl: 4/2/2014, Dispositive Motion Filing ddl: 5/23/2014, Pretrial Conference set for 8/20/2014, at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill., and Jury Trial (5 Days) set for 9/30/2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill.) (Gaumnitz, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henley v. Lowe's HIW, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's HIW, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Burkhardt Vicente
Represented By: Emily L. Aldrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Henley
Represented By: Michael J. F. Smith
Represented By: John Lawrence Migliazzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?