Mwasi v. Corcoran State Prison
Plaintiff: King Mwasi
Defendant: Corcoran State Prison
Case Number: 1:2013cv00695
Filed: May 13, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER REINSTATING 87 August 17, 2017 Findings and Recommendations to Grant Defendant's 83 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/21/18. Objections to F&R Due Within 21 Days. (Marrujo, C)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Withdrawing 87 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS to Grant Defendants' 83 Motion For Summary Judgment and Granting 93 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition Nunc Pro Tunc signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/07/2017. Sixty-Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Reinstating August 17, 2017 Findings and Recommendations to Grant Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/05/2017. Objections to F&R due by 1/2/2018. (Flores, E)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Withdrawing 87 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS to Grant Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting 88 Motion for Extension to File Opposition Nunc Pro Tunc; and Denying Plaintiff's 90 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 09/14/2017. Response Due 11/17/2017.(Flores, E)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Grant Defendants' 83 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/17/17. Objections to F&R Due Within Twenty-One Days. (Marrujo, C)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 SECOND INFORMATIONAL ORDER - Notice and Warning of Requirements for Opposing Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 33 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/31/17: 21-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER ADOPTING 69 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL and ORDER DISMISSING Defendant Dr. Mahoney From Action With Prejudice signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/27/2017. (Jessen, A)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendant Dr. Mahoney and all claims against him be DISMISSED with prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to comply with the Court's Order and to prosecute this action re 59 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by King Mwasi ; referred to Judge Drozd, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/13/16. Objections to F&R due (30-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER ADOPTING 60 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 09/17/2016. (Flores, E)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this action for damages proceed on Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint on certain claims re 59 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint ; referred to Judge Drozd,signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 05/20/2016. (30-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why the Action Should Not be Dismissed for Plaintiff's Failure to Comply With the Court's Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/14/15. Show Cause Response Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Denying 44 Motion for Law Library Access signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 05/12/2015. (Flores, E)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER on 32 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION and DISMISSING Certain Claims and Defendants signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/14/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Denying Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (Doc. 39 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/4/2015. (Fahrney, E)
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS that Case Proceed on Eighth Amendment Medical Claims Against Defendants Dr. Mahoney, Dr. Blanchard, Urbano LCSW, Doe 9; and Excessive Force and Conditions of Confinement Claims against Defendants Guards Cordova, Torres, and J. Gomez; and an ADA Claim against Defendant Dr. Nguyen and Dismissing all other Claims and Defendants, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/15/14. Referred to Judge Ishii; 30-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 30 Motion to Exceed the Page Limitation and DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/19/14. (Marrujo, C)
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Disregarding Plaintiff's 23 Motion to File First Amended Complaint as Moot signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 02/13/2014. (Flores, E)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DISCHARGING Order to Show Cause 15 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/24/13. (Hellings, J)
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why the Action Should not be Dismissed for Plaintiff's Failure to Comply with the Court's Order signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/25/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mwasi v. Corcoran State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: King Mwasi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corcoran State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?