Farm Credit West v. Lanting
Plaintiff: Farm Credit West, PCA
Defendant: Case Lanting and Jane Lanting
Case Number: 1:2013cv00712
Filed: March 26, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Placer
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Approving Stipulated Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/12/14. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER vacating hearing date of August 11, 2014 and taking matter under submission signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/5/14. (Nazaroff, H)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER on Fourth Stipulation Extending Plaintiff's Time to File a Responsive Pleading to Defendants Case and Jane Lanting's Second Amended Answer and Second Amended Counterclaim, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 3/6/14. (Verduzco, M)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' third request for an extension of time for plaintiff to file a responsive pleading to defendants' second amended answer and second amended counterclaim. Plaintiff's responsive pleading is now due on or before 2/28/2014. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 1/24/2014. (Rooney, M)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING plaintiff an extension of time to 1/24/2014 to file a responsive pleading to defendants' second amended answer and second amended counterclaim. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 12/18/2013. (Rooney, M)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of time to 12/20/2013 for receipt of plaintiff's responsive pleading to defendants' second amended answer and second amended counterclaim. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 10/16/2013. (Rooney, M)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER WITHDRAWING 26 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/13/2013. The Defendants shall file a Second Amended Answer and Counterclaim no later than September 30, 2013. (Jessen, A)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ; denying 15 Motion for More Definite Statement signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/12/2013. (Kusamura, W)
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER vacating hearing date of July 1, 2013 and taking matter under submission. signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/26/13. (Nazaroff, H)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 5/14/2013 TRANSFERRING this case, 2:13-cv-00586 LKK AC, to the Fresno Division pursuant to L.R. 120(f); VACATING all hearing dates currently set in this matter. New case number: 1:13-cv-00712 AWI SMS. (Michel, G)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 5/14/2013 ORDERING that defendant(s) shall have until 5/20/2013 to file and serve an answer to the complaint. (Donati, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farm Credit West v. Lanting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farm Credit West, PCA
Represented By: Michael Joseph Gomez
Represented By: Rene Lastreto, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Case Lanting
Represented By: Thomas O. Gillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Lanting
Represented By: Thomas O. Gillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?