Nuwintore v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Richard Nuwintore
Defendant: United States of America and Management & Training Corporation
Case Number: 1:2013cv00967
Filed: June 25, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER CLOSING the CASE 154 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/31/2018. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER AFTER 152 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/28/2018. Stipulated Dismissal due by 10/31/2018. All other pending dates, conferences and hearings are VACATED. (Hall, S)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK to Update the Docket and TERMINATE the United States of America as a Defendant 150 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/13/2018. (Hall, S)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER DIRECTING THE PARTIES to File an Amended Stipulation Pursuant to Rule 41, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/28/2018. (Hall, S)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/19/2018. (Kusamura, W)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER AFTER 141 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT with the United States of America, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/14/2018. Stipulation to dismiss or motion to dismiss due by 8/17/2018. (Hall, S)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER DENYING 132 Stipulation to Amend the Case Schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/6/2018. (Hall, S)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 STIPULATION and ORDER 127 to Set Settlement Conference and Modifying the Scheduling Order to Extend Time for Expert Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/15/2018. Expert discovery deadline 4/27/2018. Settlement Conference set for 3/5/2018 at 01:30 PM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Order APPROVING the stipulation of the parties and modifying the scheduling order to extend time for discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/27/2017. (Rosales, O)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/10/2017. Pleading Amendment Deadline 4/7/2017. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 1/23/2017; Non-Expert 12/1/2017; Expert 3/16/2018. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: F iled by 3/30/2018; Hearing by 4/27/2018. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 5/11/2018; Hearing by 7/9/2018. Settlement Conference set for 8/17/2018 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Pretrial Conference set for 9/4/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Jury Trial set for 10/30/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Hall, S)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER GRANTING 118 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to the Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/22/2016. (Hall, S)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER GRANTING Withdrawal of the Plaintiff's Motion to Amend, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/8/2016. Third Amended Complaint due by 12/12/2016. (Hall, S)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 STIPULATION and ORDER 95 to Continue Status Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/27/2016. Status Conference CONTINUED to 9/9/2016 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Joint status report due by 9/2/2016. (Hall, S)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Granting Motion for Entry of Final Judgment as to Defendant United States of America 68 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/18/14. United States of America terminated. (Verduzco, M)
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER GRANTING 73 STIPULATION to Continue Mid-Discovery Status Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/25/2014. Status Conference CONTINUED to 11/20/2014 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER vacating hearing date of July 21, 2014 and taking matter under submission signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/17/14. (Nazaroff, H)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why the Motion to Dismiss Should not be Denied as Moot and the Allegations Against the USA Set Forth in the Second Amended Complaint Deemed Dismissed, Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/27/2014. Show Cause Response Deadline: 10 Days. (Arellano, S.)
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER ADOPTING 47 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and GRANTING 30 Government's Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/23/2014. (Jessen, A)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/14/2014. Consent/Decline Deadline 5/27/2014. Pleading Amendment Deadline 8/1/2014. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 5/30/2014; Non-Expert 12/26/2014; Expert 2/13/2015. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 8/26/2014 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 2/27/2015; Hearing by 3/27/2015. Dispositive Motio n Deadlines: Filed by 4/17/2015; Hearing by 6/15/2015. Settlement Conference set for 12/18/2014 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Pretrial Conference set for 8/11/2015 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Jury Trial set for 10/6/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Hall, S)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Adopting In Full FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Granting Defendant Management & Training Corporation's Motion To Strike Plaintiff's Claim For Punitive Damages (Doc. 28 , 43 ), signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/2/2014. (Fahrney, E)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Granting the Motion to Dismiss Brought by the United States of America re 30 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/18/2014. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Denying Defendant Management & Training Corporation's Motion to Dismiss re 27 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/14/2014. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Granting Defendant Management & Training Corporation's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Claim for Punitive Damages re 28 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/28/2014. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Order referring pending motion to Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston; Order VACATING Febraury 3, 2014 hearing date, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/31/2014. (Figueroa, O)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER on Stipulation for Extension of Hearing Date as to 30 MOTION to DISMISS, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/16/14: Motion Hearing RESET to 2/3/2014 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Hellings, J)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER continuing motions from 1/13/14 to 1/27/14 at 1:30 p.m. in courtroom #2before Judge Anthony W. Ishii. signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/9/14. (Nazaroff, H)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint re 24 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/3/2013. (Hall, S)
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER re Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint 20 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/7/2013. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nuwintore v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Nuwintore
Represented By: Jason Kenneth Feldman
Represented By: Ian Michael Wallach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Management & Training Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?