October 31, 2018 |
Filing
155
ORDER CLOSING the CASE 154 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/31/2018. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
|
August 29, 2018 |
Filing
153
ORDER AFTER 152 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/28/2018. Stipulated Dismissal due by 10/31/2018. All other pending dates, conferences and hearings are VACATED. (Hall, S)
|
August 13, 2018 |
Filing
151
ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK to Update the Docket and TERMINATE the United States of America as a Defendant 150 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/13/2018. (Hall, S)
|
July 30, 2018 |
Filing
149
ORDER DIRECTING THE PARTIES to File an Amended Stipulation Pursuant to Rule 41, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/28/2018. (Hall, S)
|
July 19, 2018 |
Filing
146
ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/19/2018. (Kusamura, W)
|
June 14, 2018 |
Filing
142
ORDER AFTER 141 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT with the United States of America, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/14/2018. Stipulation to dismiss or motion to dismiss due by 8/17/2018. (Hall, S)
|
March 6, 2018 |
Filing
134
ORDER DENYING 132 Stipulation to Amend the Case Schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/6/2018. (Hall, S)
|
February 15, 2018 |
Filing
128
STIPULATION and ORDER 127 to Set Settlement Conference and Modifying the Scheduling Order to Extend Time for Expert Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/15/2018. Expert discovery deadline 4/27/2018. Settlement Conference set for 3/5/2018 at 01:30 PM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
|
October 27, 2017 |
Filing
126
Order APPROVING the stipulation of the parties and modifying the scheduling order to extend time for discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/27/2017. (Rosales, O)
|
January 10, 2017 |
Filing
122
SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/10/2017. Pleading Amendment Deadline 4/7/2017. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 1/23/2017; Non-Expert 12/1/2017; Expert 3/16/2018. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: F iled by 3/30/2018; Hearing by 4/27/2018. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 5/11/2018; Hearing by 7/9/2018. Settlement Conference set for 8/17/2018 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Pretrial Conference set for 9/4/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Jury Trial set for 10/30/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Hall, S)
|
December 22, 2016 |
Filing
119
ORDER GRANTING 118 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to the Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/22/2016. (Hall, S)
|
December 8, 2016 |
Filing
113
ORDER GRANTING Withdrawal of the Plaintiff's Motion to Amend, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/8/2016. Third Amended Complaint due by 12/12/2016. (Hall, S)
|
July 27, 2016 |
Filing
96
STIPULATION and ORDER 95 to Continue Status Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/27/2016. Status Conference CONTINUED to 9/9/2016 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Joint status report due by 9/2/2016. (Hall, S)
|
December 19, 2014 |
Filing
79
ORDER Granting Motion for Entry of Final Judgment as to Defendant United States of America 68 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/18/14. United States of America terminated. (Verduzco, M)
|
August 25, 2014 |
Filing
74
ORDER GRANTING 73 STIPULATION to Continue Mid-Discovery Status Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/25/2014. Status Conference CONTINUED to 11/20/2014 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
|
July 18, 2014 |
Filing
72
ORDER vacating hearing date of July 21, 2014 and taking matter under submission signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/17/14. (Nazaroff, H)
|
May 27, 2014 |
Filing
67
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why the Motion to Dismiss Should not be Denied as Moot and the Allegations Against the USA Set Forth in the Second Amended Complaint Deemed Dismissed, Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/27/2014. Show Cause Response Deadline: 10 Days. (Arellano, S.)
|
May 23, 2014 |
Filing
66
ORDER ADOPTING 47 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and GRANTING 30 Government's Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/23/2014. (Jessen, A)
|
May 14, 2014 |
Filing
58
SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/14/2014. Consent/Decline Deadline 5/27/2014. Pleading Amendment Deadline 8/1/2014. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 5/30/2014; Non-Expert 12/26/2014; Expert 2/13/2015. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 8/26/2014 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 2/27/2015; Hearing by 3/27/2015. Dispositive Motio n Deadlines: Filed by 4/17/2015; Hearing by 6/15/2015. Settlement Conference set for 12/18/2014 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Pretrial Conference set for 8/11/2015 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Jury Trial set for 10/6/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Hall, S)
|
April 3, 2014 |
Filing
51
ORDER Adopting In Full FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Granting Defendant Management & Training Corporation's Motion To Strike Plaintiff's Claim For Punitive Damages (Doc. 28 , 43 ), signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/2/2014. (Fahrney, E)
|
March 18, 2014 |
Filing
47
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Granting the Motion to Dismiss Brought by the United States of America re 30 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/18/2014. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
|
March 14, 2014 |
Filing
46
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Denying Defendant Management & Training Corporation's Motion to Dismiss re 27 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/14/2014. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
|
February 28, 2014 |
Filing
43
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Granting Defendant Management & Training Corporation's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Claim for Punitive Damages re 28 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/28/2014. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
|
January 31, 2014 |
Filing
41
Order referring pending motion to Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston; Order VACATING Febraury 3, 2014 hearing date, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/31/2014. (Figueroa, O)
|
January 16, 2014 |
Filing
39
ORDER on Stipulation for Extension of Hearing Date as to 30 MOTION to DISMISS, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/16/14: Motion Hearing RESET to 2/3/2014 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Hellings, J)
|
January 9, 2014 |
Filing
36
ORDER continuing motions from 1/13/14 to 1/27/14 at 1:30 p.m. in courtroom #2before Judge Anthony W. Ishii. signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/9/14. (Nazaroff, H)
|
December 3, 2013 |
Filing
26
STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint re 24 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/3/2013. (Hall, S)
|
November 7, 2013 |
Filing
21
STIPULATION and ORDER re Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint 20 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/7/2013. (Hall, S)
|