Allen v. Commissioner of Social Security

Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Kyle Kasey Allen
Case Number: 1:2013cv01002
Filed: June 28, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Plaintiff's Social Security Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/25/2014. CASE CLOSED.(Lundstrom, T)
July 10, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER On Application To Proceed Without Prepayment Of Fees, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/9/2013. (Fahrney, E)
July 5, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 4 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 07/07/2013. (Flores, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jeffrey T Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Kasey Allen
Represented By: Brian C. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?