Edwards v. Desfosses, et al.
Plaintiff: Steven R. Edwards
Defendant: A. Desfosses, E. Saldivar and S Zaccagnini
Case Number: 1:2013cv01013
Filed: July 1, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER and RECEIPT for Trial Exhibits signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/30/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER vacating 73 ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum directing the production of Gary Holden for trial signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/29/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER denying Plaintiff's request for production of Video Recording signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/24/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Request to Remove Inmate Michael Hunter From Witness List 103 ; ORDER VACATING Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum Directing the Production of Inmate Michael Hunter for Trial 72 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/18/16. (Hellings, J)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Pretrial Motions 91 , 92 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/16/16. (Hellings, J)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER RE Objections to Pretrial Order and DENYING Plaintiff's Request for Subpoena 78 , 82 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/10/16. (Hellings, J)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER RESCHEDULING Time of Motions in Limine Hearing on March 14, 2016, From 3:00 P.M. to 2:00 P.M., signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/8/16. (Hellings, J)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport Gary Holden CDCR #V-63133, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/29/16. Jury Trial set for 3/29/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Verduzco, M)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING In Part and DENYING In Part Plaintiff's Motions for the Attendance of Incarcerated Witnesses re 47 , 51 & 56 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/4/16. (Marrujo, C)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Further Disclosure (ECF No. 54 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/29/2016. (Fahrney, E)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Directing Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's 54 Motion for Further Disclosure signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 01/19/2016. (Flores, E)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff Leave to File a Supplemental Motion for the Attendance of Incarcerated Witnesses, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/5/16: Supplemental Motion Due January 25, 2016. (Hellings, J)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER RESCHEDULING Telephonic Conference Call on November 9, 2015, From 4:00 p.m. to 9:00 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/5/15. (Marrujo, C)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/30/2015 setting Telephonic Conference Call for 11/9/2015 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Lundstrom, T)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER assigning case to Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/16/2015. New Case Number is 1:13-cv-01013-SAB-PC. (Lundstrom, T)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (ECF No. 38 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/30/2015. (Fahrney, E)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER REQUIRING Parties to Notify Court Whether a Settlement Conference Would be Beneficial, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/16/2015. Thirty-Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting Defendants' Request For Leave To Take Plaintiff's Deposition By Videoconference (Doc. 24 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/23/2015. (Fahrney, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Desfosses, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven R. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Desfosses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Saldivar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Zaccagnini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?