A.A. et al v. Clovis Unified School District et al
Plaintiff: A. A., L. A. and A., Jr. A.
Defendant: Clovis Unified School District, Clovis SELPA and Mary Bass
Case Number: 1:2013cv01043
Filed: July 5, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1401 Education: Handicapped Child Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND ORDER ;The foregoing Stipulation of the parties is accepted and approved, and this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys fees and costs, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 05/04/18. CASE CLOSED (Martin-Gill, S)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER (1) ADOPTING 129 Findings and Recommendations, (2) Appointing A.A. and L.A. as Guardians Ad Litem for A.A., Jr.; and (3) Approving Petition for Court Approval of Mediated Settlement Agreement; ORDER VACATING All Pending Dates and Matters; signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/23/18. (Marrujo, C)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS TO: (1) Appoint A.A. and L.A. Co-Guardians At Litem for A.A., Jr. and (2) Approve petition for court approval of mediated settlement agreement 121 signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/5/2018. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Objections to F&R's due within 14-Days.(Lundstrom, T)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' PETITION TO FILE UNDER SEAL, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/22/2018. (Kusamura, W)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER GRANTING 112 Motion to File Declarations of Kristine Lachs, Bekah Blanchette and Briana Williams in Support of Defendants' Brief Regarding the Plaintiffs' Petition for Approval of the Mediated Settlement Agreement Under Seal signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/1/2017. (Jessen, A)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 SECOND ORDER REQUIRING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING FROM PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS; TEN (10) DAY DEADLINE, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/20/2017. (Bernacchi, M)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER REQUIRING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ON PETITION FOR COURT TO APPROVE MEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/29/2017. (Kusamura, W)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER GRANTING 103 Request to File Documents Under Seal signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/4/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER MODIFYING SCHEDULE FOR ADDITIONAL BRIEFING, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/20/2017. (Kusamura, W)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER SETTING OUT SCHEDULE FOR ADDITIONAL BRIEFING, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/10/2017. (Kusamura, W)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER re: NOTICE TO COURT OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION REGARDING PREVIOUSLY UNDISCLOSED RECORDINGS; Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/15/2016. (Kusamura, W)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER reassigning case to the Honorable Michael J. Seng signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/27/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STIPULATION and ORDER re Recording signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/27/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER GRANTING GRANTING plaintiffs' Motion for an Extension of Time to Conduct Discovery, documents 66 and 69 . The parties are ordered to complete all discovery pertaining to non-experts on or before 8/19/2016, and all discovery pertaining t o experts on or before 9/23/2016. All pre-trial and trial dates set forth in the 2/26/2015 scheduling order are VACATED. The Court will issue an amended scheduling order. Counsel are to meet and confer regarding said proposed amended scheduling and notify Courtroom Deputy Michelle Rooney in writing on or before March 4, 2016, of their joint acceptance or alternative suggestions. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 2/17/2016. (Rooney, M)
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING plaintiffs' motion to supplement the first amended complaint, document 49 . Plaintiffs are to file their supplemented first amended complaint within seven days of entry of this order. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/1/2015. (Rooney, M)
December 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER SETTING a mandatory scheduling conference for 2/25/2015 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 12/31/2014. (Rooney, M)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting 38 Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/18/2014. (Defendants motion is GRANTED. The intentional infliction of emotional distress and negligence claims against Defendant Bass in her personal capacity are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.) (Gaumnitz, R)
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER re Defendants' 22 Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/11/2014. (Marrujo, C)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER vacating hearing date of November 18, 2013 and taking matter under submission. signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/13/13. (Nazaroff, H)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER VACATING the Initial Scheduling Conference currently noticed for 10/8/2013 before Magistrate Stanley A. Boone, pursuant to the reassignment order dated 7/9/2013, document 8 , and RE-SETTING the matter to 10/9/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 (SMS) before Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/10/2013. (Rooney, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.A. et al v. Clovis Unified School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clovis Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clovis SELPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. A.
Represented By: Marianne Elizabeth Malveaux
Represented By: Yvette Claudia Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. A.
Represented By: Marianne Elizabeth Malveaux
Represented By: Yvette Claudia Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A., Jr. A.
Represented By: Marianne Elizabeth Malveaux
Represented By: Yvette Claudia Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?